Geiger et al v. Monroe County, Mississippi et al
Plaintiff: Robbie Keeton Geiger, Delisha Keeton Mooney and Megan Archer
Defendant: Monroe County, Mississippi and Eric Sloan
Case Number: 1:2016cv00095
Filed: June 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Presiding Judge: David A. Sanders
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER granting 119 Motion in Limine. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 9/9/20. (jla)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER denying 118 Motion in Limine. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 9/8/20. (jla)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER GRANTING 101 Motion to Strike Expert Designation; GRANTING Motion to Exclude Opinion Testimony. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 9/3/20. (jla) Modified on 9/3/2020 (jla).
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER reinstating Motions 101 , 116 , 118 , 119 pursuant to USCA's Judgment. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 9/4/19. (jla)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. CASE CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 8/9/18. (jla)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting 149 Motion to Stay, continuing trial until further notice, and deferring ruling on Motions 101 , 116 , 118 , 119 . Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 7/10/2018. (dbm)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 142 Order on Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 6/18/2018. (dbm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geiger et al v. Monroe County, Mississippi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robbie Keeton Geiger
Represented By: Jim D. Waide, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delisha Keeton Mooney
Represented By: Jim D. Waide, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Archer
Represented By: Jim D. Waide, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monroe County, Mississippi
Represented By: Daniel J. Griffith
Represented By: Arnulfo Ursua Luciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Sloan
Represented By: Daniel J. Griffith
Represented By: Arnulfo Ursua Luciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?