Shumpert et al v. City of Tupelo, Mississippi et al
Plaintiff: Peggy Shumpert and Charles Foster
Defendant: City of Tupelo, Mississippi, Jason Shelton, Bart Aguirre, Tyler Cook and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2016cv00120
Filed: June 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Glen H. Davidson
Presiding Judge: David A. Sanders
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 214 FINAL JUDGMENT for Defendants. All claims are dismissed with prejudice. This CASE is CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 11/16/2017. (dbm)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 212 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 211 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 11/6/2017. (dbm)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER denying 121 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 6/7/2017. (rrz)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting 89 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 5/15/2017. (rrz)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying 12 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 10/18/2016. (psk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shumpert et al v. City of Tupelo, Mississippi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Shumpert
Represented By: Tameika L. Bennett
Represented By: Carlos Eugene Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Foster
Represented By: Carlos Eugene Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Tupelo, Mississippi
Represented By: John Samuel Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Shelton
Represented By: John Samuel Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bart Aguirre
Represented By: John Samuel Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Cook
Represented By: John Samuel Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?