Xpansion Holdings, LLC v. The Retail Coach, LLC
Plaintiff: |
Xpansion Holdings, LLC |
Defendant: |
The Retail Coach, LLC |
Counter_claimant: |
The Retail Coach, LLC |
Counter_defendant: |
Xpansion Holdings, LLC |
Case Number: |
1:2016cv00125 |
Filed: |
July 7, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi |
Office: |
Aberdeen Division Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Sharion Aycock |
Presiding Judge: |
David A. Sanders |
Nature of Suit: |
Trademark |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. ยง 1121 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Defendant |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 20, 2017 |
Filing
51
AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 10/20/2017. (adm)
|
March 3, 2017 |
Filing
34
MEMORANDUM OPINION re 33 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Stay, and Transfer. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 3/3/2017. (adm)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Xpansion Holdings, LLC v. The Retail Coach, LLC |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: The Retail Coach, LLC |
Represented By: |
Allen E. Graham |
Represented By: |
Michael S. Hooker |
Represented By: |
Bradley R Sanders, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Jason Paul Stearns |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Xpansion Holdings, LLC |
Represented By: |
Emily Sides Bonds |
Represented By: |
William K Hancock |
Represented By: |
Andrew Scott Harris |
Represented By: |
Walter Francis Scott, III |
Represented By: |
Paul O Woodall, Jr |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_claimant: The Retail Coach, LLC |
Represented By: |
Allen E. Graham |
Represented By: |
Michael S. Hooker |
Represented By: |
Bradley R Sanders, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Jason Paul Stearns |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_defendant: Xpansion Holdings, LLC |
Represented By: |
Emily Sides Bonds |
Represented By: |
William K Hancock |
Represented By: |
Andrew Scott Harris |
Represented By: |
Walter Francis Scott, III |
Represented By: |
Paul O Woodall, Jr |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?