Easley v. Schilling Foods, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Shannon Easley
Defendant: Schilling Foods, LLC and SuperValu, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv00213
Filed: November 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
County: Chickasaw
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Presiding Judge: David A. Sanders
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER DISMISSING CASE BY REASON OF SETTLEMENT. CASE CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 11/28/2017. (adm)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 36 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 10/20/2017. (adm)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AGREED ORDER granting 16 Motion to Set Aside Default. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 3/20/2017. (adm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Easley v. Schilling Foods, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Easley
Represented By: Robert N. Norris
Represented By: Louis H. Watson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schilling Foods, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SuperValu, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?