Ronaldo Designer Jewelry, Inc. v. Cox et al
Plaintiff: Ronaldo Designer Jewelry, Inc.
Defendant: James B. Cox, Catherine A. Cox, John Doe and John Does Numbers 1 through 99
Case Number: 1:2017cv00002
Filed: January 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Debra M. Brown
Presiding Judge: David A. Sanders
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 395 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. CASE CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 4/9/20. (jla)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 381 ORDER denying without prejudice 253 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 3/6/2020. (jwr)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER finding as moot 301 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 1/9/20. (jla)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 370 ORDER LIFTING STAY. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 11/22/19. (jla)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER REFERRING CAUSE to the Register of Copyrights; directing Clerk to forward documents. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 9/10/19. (jla)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 365 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 143 MOTION Issuance of Request to Register of Copyrights Pursuant to 17 U.S.C. 411(b)(2) filed by James B. Cox, Catherine A. Cox. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 08/22/2019. (jwr)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 143 Motion for request to Register. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 7/16/19. (bds)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 319 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 6/14/19. (tab)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER re 143 MOTION Issuance of Request to Register of Copyrights; plaintiff directed to file a supplemental response to motion within 7 days; Defendant's may file a supplemental reply within 7 days after. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 4/24/19. (jla)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER granting 104 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in part 105 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 3/18/19. (jtm)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER dismissing 232 Motion to Quash; dismissing 234 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 1/30/19. (jcm)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER denying 138 Motion to Quash; denying 145 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 10/1/18. (jcm)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting 92 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; Counts XI through XV of the Coxes' counterclaims are DISMISSED without prejudice; the Coxes may file amended counterclaims as to the counts dismissed within 21 days. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 3/16/18. (jla)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER denying 11 Motion for TRO. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 9/5/17. (cr)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 2/22/17. (rel)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying 4 Motion for TRO. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 1/19/17. (bds)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ronaldo Designer Jewelry, Inc. v. Cox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronaldo Designer Jewelry, Inc.
Represented By: Alec Michael Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James B. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does Numbers 1 through 99
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?