Britt v. Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Megan Britt
Defendant: Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company, George Bubba Cole, Barry Patton, Brenda Wheat, Tina Stapp, Roy Weathers and Southern Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2017cv00219
Filed: December 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
County: Clay
Presiding Judge: Debra M. Brown
Referring Judge: David A. Sanders
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER finding as moot 36 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; finding as moot 41 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; finding as moot 44 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 44 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Clai m; finding as moot 44 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 88 Motion to Dismiss; denying 90 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 92 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 100 Motion for Extension of Time t o File Response/Reply ; finding as moot 104 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; finding as moot 105 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; finding as moot 26 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; fi nding as moot 28 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; finding as moot 28 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; finding as moot 33 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 3/26/2019. (llw)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting 48 Motion for Leave to File; denying 77 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 7/17/18. (def)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Sharion Aycock recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Debra M. Brown for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 1/23/18. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Britt v. Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Britt
Represented By: Sidney Ray Hill, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Rebecca Jordan Blunden
Represented By: James R. Moore, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Bubba Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Wheat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Weathers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?