Limoss US, LLC v. Kaidi LLC et al
Plaintiff: Limoss US, LLC
Defendant: Changzhou Kaidi Electrical Co., Ltd. and Kaidi LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00166
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 1/4/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 10/17/18. (rtc)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 10/17/18. (bnd)
October 17, 2018 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint --- Proposed Orders are not to be filed but emailed to chambers in Word format. (jla)
October 16, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Changzhou Kaidi Electrical Co., Ltd., Kaidi LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint) (Watkins, Walter)
October 5, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J. Cal Mayo, Jr on behalf of Limoss US, LLC Changzhou Kaidi Electrical Co., Ltd. served on 9/27/2018. (Mayo, J.)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Russell A. Korn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 10/4/18. (bnd)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Joshua H. Lee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 10/4/18. (bnd)
October 4, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J. Cal Mayo, Jr on behalf of Limoss US, LLC (Mayo, J.)
October 4, 2018 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #8 Summons Returned Executed; Please file first page of returned summons (jla)
October 3, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J. Cal Mayo, Jr on behalf of Limoss US, LLC Kaidi LLC served on 9/25/2018. (Mayo, J.)
October 2, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Russell A. Korn,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1601880) by Limoss US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Mayo, J.)
October 2, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Joshua H. Lee,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1601875) by Limoss US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Mayo, J.)
September 4, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kate Mauldin Embry on behalf of Limoss US, LLC (Embry, Kate)
September 4, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Mayo, J.)
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 Remark; AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark forwarded to Director of US Patent and Trademark Office via USPS (jla)
September 4, 2018 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Changzhou Kaidi Electrical Co., Ltd., Kaidi LLC.; emailed to Attorney for service (jla)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1591167, filed by Limoss US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 717 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - Kaidi Advertising, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Limoss US, LLC v. Kaidi LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Limoss US, LLC
Represented By: J. Cal Mayo, Jr.
Represented By: Kate Mauldin Embry
Represented By: Russell A. Korn
Represented By: Joshua H. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Changzhou Kaidi Electrical Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Walter G. Watkins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaidi LLC
Represented By: Walter G. Watkins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?