Sanders v. Magnolia Regional Health Center et al

Plaintiff: Heather Sanders
Defendant: John Does 1-5 and Magnolia Regional Health Center
Case Number: 1:2018cv00176
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Baskin L. Jones on behalf of Heather Sanders to Magnolia Regional Health Center. (Jones, Baskin)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2018 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Proposed Case Management Order and Confidential Settlement Memos due not later than 11/28/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 10/22/2018. (jf)
October 19, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Support re #5 MOTION for Bench Trial filed by Magnolia Regional Health Center. (Dillard, Lamar)
October 16, 2018 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Support re #5 MOTION for Bench Trial filed by Heather Sanders. (Jones, Baskin)
October 2, 2018 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #5 MOTION for Bench Trial . (Dillard, Lamar)
October 2, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Bench Trial by Magnolia Regional Health Center. (Dillard, Lamar)
October 2, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Magnolia Regional Health Center. (Dillard, Lamar)
September 19, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lamar Bradley Dillard on behalf of Magnolia Regional Health Center (Dillard, Lamar)
September 18, 2018 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)
September 18, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Magnolia Regional Health Center; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
September 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1596195, filed by Heather Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to Magnolia Regional Health, #2 Exhibit Attorney Certificate, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders v. Magnolia Regional Health Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magnolia Regional Health Center
Represented By: Lamar Bradley Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Sanders
Represented By: Baskin L. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?