HIG Staffing Solutions, LLC v. Relias, LLC
Plaintiff: HIG Staffing Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Relias, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00203
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125la
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Relias, LLC answer due 1/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 12/10/18. (def)
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Andrew Mauldin on behalf of Relias, LLC (Mauldin, John)
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 CORPORATE STATEMENT of Relias LLC. (Mayo, J.)
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Relias, LLC. (Mayo, J.)
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. Cal Mayo, Jr on behalf of Relias, LLC (Mayo, J.)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephan L. McDavid on behalf of HIG Staffing Solutions, LLC HIG Staffing Solutions, LLC served on 11/13/2018. (McDavid, Stephan)
November 13, 2018 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Relias, LLC; emailed to Attorney for service (jla)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1615300, filed by HIG Staffing Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (jla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2018: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla). Modified on 11/13/2018 (jla).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HIG Staffing Solutions, LLC v. Relias, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HIG Staffing Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Stephan L. McDavid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Relias, LLC
Represented By: J. Cal Mayo, Jr.
Represented By: John Andrew Mauldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?