Davis v. City of West Point, Mississippi

Plaintiff: Dylan Shane Davis
Defendant: City of West Point, Mississippi
Case Number: 1:2018cv00221
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Glen H Davidson
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Orlando Rodriquez Richmond, Sr on behalf of City of West Point, Mississippi (Richmond, Orlando)
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jim D. Waide, III on behalf of Dylan Shane Davis City of West Point, Mississippi served on 1/4/2018. (Waide, Jim)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against City of West Point, Mississippi, Jury Demand, filed by Dylan Shane Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: EEOC Charge) (Waide, Jim)
November 29, 2018 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Glen H Davidson and Magistrate Judge David A Sanders. (tab)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to City of West Point, Mississippi. E-mailed to attorney for service. (tab)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1621175, filed by Dylan Shane Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Charge of Discrimination, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. City of West Point, Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dylan Shane Davis
Represented By: Jim D. Waide, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of West Point, Mississippi
Represented By: Orlando Rodriquez Richmond, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?