Parrish v. Wells Fargo, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Patricia Parrish
Defendant: Wells Fargo, N.A. and Dean Morris, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00232
Filed: December 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Neal B Biggers
2 Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time (until 2/14/19) to File a Reply re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS. Replies now due by 2/14/2019. No further written order will issue from this Court. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 2/7/2019. (no document attached) (dbm)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Sharion Aycock for all further proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 2/6/19. (jla)
February 6, 2019 NOTICE Cancelling Case Management Conference set for 2/19/19 re #16 Order Staying Case (rtc)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/6/19. (bnd)
February 1, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Wells Fargo, N.A.. (Meyer, Christopher)
January 31, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Patricia Parrish. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Patty Parrish) (Hanson, Macy)
January 17, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Wells Fargo, N.A.. (Meyer, Christopher)
January 17, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Wells Fargo, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Note, #2 Exhibit B - Deed of Trust, #3 Exhibit C - Order of Transfer, #4 Exhibit D - Dismissal) (Meyer, Christopher)
January 16, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Dean Morris, LLC. (Crowell, Elizabeth)
January 14, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; Dean Morris, LLC waiver sent on 12/12/2018. (Hanson, Macy)
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Dean Morris, LLC (jla)
January 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Conference: Case Management Conference reset for 2/19/2019 03:00 PM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wells Fargo, N.A. answer due 1/17/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 12/21/18. (bnd)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Wells Fargo, N.A.. (Meyer, Christopher)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 2/4/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 12/19/18. (rtc)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alan Daniel Leeth on behalf of Wells Fargo, N.A. (Leeth, Alan)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher D. Meyer on behalf of Wells Fargo, N.A. (Meyer, Christopher)
December 12, 2018 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Biggers and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)
December 12, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Dean Morris, LLC, Wells Fargo, N.A.; emailed to Attorney for service (jla)
December 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1624932, filed by Patricia Parrish. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Chancery Court Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - 12/19/17 Foreclosure Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - CFPB Bulletin on Dual Tracking, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parrish v. Wells Fargo, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Parrish
Represented By: Macy Derald Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo, N.A.
Represented By: Christopher D. Meyer
Represented By: Alan Daniel Leeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Morris, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Crowell Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?