Hampton v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Clara Hampton
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2019cv00011
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
0 Judge: Sharion Aycock
1 Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Nancy A. Berryhill answer due 4/15/2019. (jla)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ricky Brian Clark on behalf of Clara Hampton All Defendants. (Clark, Ricky)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General; returned to Attorney via SASE (jla)
January 11, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Sharion Aycock and Magistrate Judge Jane M Virden. (tab)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-16335581, filed by Clara Hampton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hampton v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clara Hampton
Represented By: Ricky Brian Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?