White v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Connie White
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00012
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
0 Judge: Sharion Aycock
1 Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
March 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by C. Emanuel Smith on behalf of Connie White (Smith, C.)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (jla)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kenneth Mayfield on behalf of Connie White (Mayfield, Kenneth)
January 14, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1633850, filed by Connie White. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie White
Represented By: C. Emanuel Smith
Represented By: Kenneth Mayfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?