Rush et al v. Regions et al
Plaintiff: Zorri N. Rush and Elaine A. Rush
Defendant: Regions and Bonita Martin
Case Number: 1:2019cv00019
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Debra M Brown
2 Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Sharion Aycock for all further proceedings. District Judge Debra M. Brown no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 3/14/19. (jtm)
March 1, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION To Transfer Case to Southern District by Zorri N. Rush. (jwr)
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief by Zorri N. Rush. (jtm)
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Zorri N. Rush. (jtm)
February 4, 2019 Filing 8 Objection to #7 Order to Show Cause. (jtm)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 2/7/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 1/31/19. (bnd)
January 30, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bonita Martin, Regions, filed by Zorri N. Rush. (jtm)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 2/13/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 1/30/19. (bnd)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Pro Se Consent & Registration to Receive Documents Electronically (jtm)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Debra M. Brown and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (jtm)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Zorri N. Rush. (jtm)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Zorri N. Rush. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets, #2 Attachment) (jtm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rush et al v. Regions et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonita Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zorri N. Rush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine A. Rush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?