Snyder v. L-3 Communications Vertex Aerospace LLC

Plaintiff: Joyce Snyder
Defendant: L-3 Communications Vertex Aerospace LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00034
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Pre-Discovery Disclosure of Core Information by Ronnie Lee Woodruff on behalf of Joyce Snyder to Defendant. (Woodruff, Ronnie)
April 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents by Ronnie Lee Woodruff on behalf of Joyce Snyder to Defendant. (Woodruff, Ronnie)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial - set for 3/16/2020 - 09:40 AM - in Aberdeen Bankruptcy Courthouse - Courtroom 2 - before District Judge Sharion Aycock. (mrt)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/25/2020 at 10:30 AM in Oxford Visiting Magistrate Judge Chambers before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Discovery due by 9/23/2019. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 5/20/2019. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 6/17/2019. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 7/15/2019. Motions due by 10/7/2019. Settlement Conference set for 7/30/2019 10:30 AM in Oxford Visiting Magistrate Judge Chambers before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 2/14/2019. (jf)
February 13, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER severing case and directing Clerk to open a new civil action. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 2/17/19. (jla)
February 8, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by L-3 Communications Vertex Aerospace LLC. (jla)
November 30, 2017 Filing 2 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand,, filed by Joyce Snyder. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snyder v. L-3 Communications Vertex Aerospace LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Snyder
Represented By: Jim D. Waide, III
Represented By: Ronnie Lee Woodruff
Represented By: Rachel Pierce Waide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L-3 Communications Vertex Aerospace LLC
Represented By: LaToya C. Merritt
Represented By: Mark D. Fijman
Represented By: Howard David Clark, III
Represented By: Nikita S. McMillian
Represented By: William T. Siler, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?