Welch v. Pepsi Co Beverages Inc.

Plaintiff: Nicholas Welch
Defendant: Pepsi Co Beverages Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00040
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Pepsi Co Beverages Inc. answer due 4/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 4/22/19. (jcm)
April 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or Other Responsive Pleading by Pepsi Co Beverages Inc.. (Ireland, Robert)
April 9, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Pepsi Co Beverages Inc. answer due 4/23/2019. (jla)
April 4, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed 4/2/2019. (jwr)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #4 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. (cr)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Pepsi Co Beverages Inc. Delivered to USM for service. (jtm)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 2/27/19. (jcm)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Nicholas Welch. (jla)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT,, filed by Nicholas Welch. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Welch v. Pepsi Co Beverages Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pepsi Co Beverages Inc.
Represented By: Robert B. Ireland, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?