Rush v. Garfield Clinic

Plaintiff: Zorri N. Rush
Defendant: Garfield Clinic
Case Number: 1:2019cv00053
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
0 Judge: Sharion Aycock
1 Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Sharion Aycock and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (jtm)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Mississippi Southern; Case Number 3:19-cv-00129. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. The Court transfers this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi, Aberdeen Division, under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). The Clerk of Court is therefore directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court, Northern District, Aberdeen Division. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 2/28/2019 (VM) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 3/6/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Consent and Registration Form to Receive Documents Electronically by Zorri N. Rush. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(VM) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 3/6/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Zorri N. Rush (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cwl) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 3/6/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Garfield Clinic, filed by Zorri N. Rush. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(cwl) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 3/6/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rush v. Garfield Clinic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zorri N. Rush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garfield Clinic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?