Lucas v. AW Manufacturing, Inc.

Plaintiff: Marina Lucas
Defendant: AW Manufacturing, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00055
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by AW Manufacturing, Inc.. (Dillard, Lamar)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer AW Manufacturing, Inc. answer due 5/3/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 4/10/19. (def)
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by AW Manufacturing, Inc.. (Dillard, Lamar)
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE STATEMENT of AW Manufacturing, Inc.. (Dillard, Lamar)
April 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lamar Bradley Dillard on behalf of AW Manufacturing, Inc. (Dillard, Lamar)
March 6, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Neal B Biggers and Magistrate Judge David Sanders. (tab)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to AW Manufacturing, Inc. E-mailed to attorney for service. (tab)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1652612, filed by Marina Lucas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit B Right to Sue Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucas v. AW Manufacturing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marina Lucas
Represented By: Richard Shane McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AW Manufacturing, Inc.
Represented By: Lamar Bradley Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?