Green et al v. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Pamela D. Green and Marcus Green
Defendant: Standard Guaranty Insurance Company, American Security Insurance Company, Assurant, Inc., Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company and Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00076
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MEMORANDUM OPINION re #96 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 3/8/2022. (llw)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting #60 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 3/8/2022. (llw)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 REPLY to Response to Motion re #86 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Any and All Evidence or Documents Not Already Produced by Plaintiffs in Discovery and Prohibiting Late and Prejudicial Supplementation filed by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Drinkwater, William)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 RESPONSE in Opposition re #86 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Any and All Evidence or Documents Not Already Produced by Plaintiffs in Discovery and Prohibiting Late and Prejudicial Supplementation filed by Marcus Green, Pamela D. Green. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email-Chain Between Woods Drinkwater and Macy Hanson) (Hanson, Macy)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 8/23/2021. (kbt)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE Cancelling trial set for September 13, 2021 (kbt)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders: Telephonic Final Pretrial Conference held on 8/19/2021. (jf)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #90 MOTION in Limine No. 6 to Exclude Speculative Economic Damages . (Drinkwater, William)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MOTION in Limine No. 6 to Exclude Speculative Economic Damages by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Drinkwater, William)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #88 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Exclude Punitive Damages . (Drinkwater, William)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Exclude Punitive Damages by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Drinkwater, William)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #86 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Any and All Evidence or Documents Not Already Produced by Plaintiffs in Discovery and Prohibiting Late and Prejudicial Supplementation . (Drinkwater, William)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Any and All Evidence or Documents Not Already Produced by Plaintiffs in Discovery and Prohibiting Late and Prejudicial Supplementation by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Greens' Discovery Production) (Drinkwater, William)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #84 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Any and All Reference to Alleged Misconduct or Wrongdoing Occurring Prior to January 4, 2018 or, in the Alternative, to Eliminate Any Measure of Damages Related to Alleged Misconduct or Wrongdoing Occurring Prior t . (Drinkwater, William)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Any and All Reference to Alleged Misconduct or Wrongdoing Occurring Prior to January 4, 2018 or, in the Alternative, to Eliminate Any Measure of Damages Related to Alleged Misconduct or Wrongdoing Occurring Prior to January 4, 2018 by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Drinkwater, William)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #82 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Any and All Reference to Prior Lender Placed Insurance Class Action . (Drinkwater, William)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Any and All Reference to Prior Lender Placed Insurance Class Action by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Drinkwater, William)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #80 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Reference to Any and All Medical Damages . (Drinkwater, William)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Reference to Any and All Medical Damages by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Drinkwater, William)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #78 MOTION in Limine to Bifurcate Proceedings . (Drinkwater, William)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MOTION in Limine to Bifurcate Proceedings by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Drinkwater, William)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE by William Woods Drinkwater on behalf of Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC re #60 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Filing of Documents in Support of Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition of Loretta Poch, #2 Exhibit Notice of Mortgage Payment Change, August 6, 2013, #3 Exhibit Notice of Mortgage Payment Change, January 2, 2014, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff's Motion to Reinstate Stay, #5 Exhibit Order Reinstating Stay) (Drinkwater, William)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 REPLY to Response to Motion re #60 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Drinkwater, William)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Standing Order in Re: The Novel Coronavirus (COVID-19), Addendum on Juror Vaccinations. Signed by the U. S. District Judges for the Northern District of Mississippi on 5/3/2021. (kbt)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #74 Response; All related filings to motion should be linked back to the original motion. Court staff has made the correction. (jla)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Response to #62 Itemization of Facts re #60 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Hanson, Macy) Modified on 7/23/2021 (jla).
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Plaintiffs' TCPA and FCRA Claims Only. (Hanson, Macy)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 RESPONSE in Opposition re #60 MOTION for Summary Judgment (on the fraud, FDCPA, breach of contract, and breach of the duty of good faith and fair dealing claims) filed by Marcus Green, Pamela D. Green. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit May 1, 2019, SLS Account Statement, #2 Exhibit March 15, 2019, SLS Account Statement, #3 Exhibit April 9, 2019, SLS Account Statement, #4 Exhibit Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Transcript Exceprts of SLS, #5 Exhibit Notice of Modification of Mortgage Payment for LPI Escrow Filed by SLS, #6 Exhibit Motion to Reinstate Automatic Stay as to SLS in Ch. 13 BK, #7 Exhibit Order Granting Motion to Reinstate Automatic Stay, #8 Affidavit Affidavit of Ronald Wilson, VP of Assurant Insurance Companies, #9 Exhibit Greens' Responses to First Set of Interrogatories) (Hanson, Macy)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Governing Final Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 7/19/2021. (jf)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference reset as Telephonic on 8/19/2021 at 1:30 PM from Amory Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Draft of Final Pretrial Order due by 8/16/2021. (jf)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #67 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #60 MOTION for Summary Judgment Responses due by 7/22/2021. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 7/16/2021. (llw)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 RESPONSE in Opposition re #67 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #60 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Drinkwater, William)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #60 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Marcus Green, Pamela D. Green. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit June 22, 2021, Email from Macy Hanson to Chambers and Opp. Counsel, #2 Exhibit June 24, 2021, Email from Beth Featherston to Macy Hanson) (Hanson, Macy)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING of Audio Recording re #60 MOTION for Summary Judgment by William Woods Drinkwater on behalf of Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Drinkwater, William) Modified on 6/22/2021 (jla).
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Remark: Exhibit C to #65 Affidavit of Cynthia Wallace in Support of #60 MOTION for Summary Judgment received and placed on shelf in clerk's office Oxford. (jwr) Modified on 1/31/2022 (jla).
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 AFFIDAVIT of Cynthia Wallace in Support of #60 Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Mortgage Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Annual Escrow Statements, #3 Exhibit C - May 14, 2018 audio recording, #4 Exhibit D - Credit report forms) (Drinkwater, William) Modified on 6/21/2021 to link to motion (jwr).
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 AFFIDAVIT of Woods Drinkwater in Support of #60 Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Tracfone Wireless Call Logs, #2 Exhibit B - Transunion Dispute Letter, #3 Exhibit C - Experian Dispute Letter) (Drinkwater, William) Modified on 6/21/2021 to link to motion (jwr).
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE by William Woods Drinkwater on behalf of Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC re #60 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Filing of Deposition Excerpts (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition of Loretta Pock, #2 Exhibit Deposition of Pamela Green, #3 Exhibit Deposition of Marcus Green) (Drinkwater, William)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ITEMIZATION OF FACTS re #60 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Drinkwater, William)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #60 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Drinkwater, William)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Drinkwater, William)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES. Discovery due by 5/28/2021. Motions due by 6/11/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 5/11/21. (cs)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Pamela D. Green by William Woods Drinkwater on behalf of Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC (Drinkwater, William)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Marcus Green by William Woods Drinkwater on behalf of Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC (Drinkwater, William)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #46 Motion to Disallow Plaintiffs' Use of Experts for Failure to Make a Timely Disclosure. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 4/27/21. (cs)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders: Motion Hearing held on 4/12/2021 re #46 MOTION to Disallow Plaintiffs' Use of Experts for Failure to Make a Timely Disclosure filed by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC *Audio Recorded during Proceeding. (Court Reporter digital.) (cs)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #46 MOTION to Disallow Plaintiffs' Use of Experts for Failure to Make a Timely Disclosure : Motion Hearing set for 4/12/2021 at 1:30 PM via Zoom from Amory Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Zoom information will be emailed to counsel. (jf)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders: Telephonic Settlement Conference held on 3/23/2021. No Settlement Agreement (jf)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE Resetting Conference:Telephonic Settlement Conference reset for 3/23/2021 at 10:00 AM from Amory Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Court will initiate calls to counsel beginning at 10:00 a.m. (jf)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 REPLY to Response to Motion re #46 MOTION to Disallow Plaintiffs' Use of Experts for Failure to Make a Timely Disclosure filed by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Drinkwater, William)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 RESPONSE in Opposition re #46 MOTION to Disallow Plaintiffs' Use of Experts for Failure to Make a Timely Disclosure and Motion for Continuance of Discovery and Expert Designation Deadlines in #31 Case Management Order filed by Marcus Green, Pamela D. Green. (Hanson, Macy)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 TEXT ONLY ORDER terminating #43 Motion to Disallow Plaintiffs' Use of Experts for Failure to Make a Timely Disclosure due to refiling at #46 . No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 3/1/21. (no document attached) (cs) Modified on 3/2/2021 (jla).
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 GOOD FAITH CERTIFICATE re #47 Memorandum in Support, #46 MOTION to Disallow Plaintiffs' Use of Experts for Failure to Make a Timely Disclosure . (Drinkwater, William)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #46 MOTION to Disallow Plaintiffs' Use of Experts for Failure to Make a Timely Disclosure . (Drinkwater, William)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION to Disallow Plaintiffs' Use of Experts for Failure to Make a Timely Disclosure by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit 2 - Requests for Production of Documents) (Drinkwater, William)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #43 MOTION to Disallow Plaintiffs' Use of Experts for Failure to Make a Timely Disclosure , #44 Memorandum in Support; All exhibits should be filed with the motion to which they relate and not the memorandum brief, as required by L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2). Attorney to refile motion and memorandum brief. (jla)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 GOOD FAITH CERTIFICATE re #43 MOTION to Disallow Plaintiffs' Use of Experts for Failure to Make a Timely Disclosure , #44 Memorandum in Support, . (Drinkwater, William)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #43 MOTION to Disallow Plaintiffs' Use of Experts for Failure to Make a Timely Disclosure . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit 2 - Requests for Production of Documents) (Drinkwater, William)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION to Disallow Plaintiffs' Use of Experts for Failure to Make a Timely Disclosure by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Drinkwater, William)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE resetting Conference:Telephonic Settlement Conference set for 3/18/2021 10:00 AM in Amory Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. (cs)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Marcus Green by William Woods Drinkwater on behalf of Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC (Drinkwater, William)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Pamela Green by William Woods Drinkwater on behalf of Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC (Drinkwater, William)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC by Macy Derald Hanson on behalf of Marcus Green, Pamela D. Green (Hanson, Macy)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Polansky on behalf of Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC (Polansky, Kevin)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #35 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Kevin P. Polansky. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 11/10/20. (cs)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE by William Woods Drinkwater on behalf of Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC re Notice of Correction, #35 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Kevin P. Polansky,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1872484) Notice of Filing (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - Massachusetts, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - Connecticut, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - Maine, #4 Certificate of Good Standing - New Hampshire, #5 Certificate of Good Standing - U.S. Court of Appeals for the First Circuit, #6 Certificate of Good Standing - U.S. Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit) (Drinkwater, William)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #35 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Kevin P. Polansky,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1872484); Attorney to provide a certificate of good standing from each licensing authority where admitted to practice law as required by L.U.Civ.R. 83.1(d)(4). (jla)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Kevin P. Polansky,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1872484) by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Drinkwater, William)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC by Macy Derald Hanson on behalf of Marcus Green, Pamela D. Green (Hanson, Macy)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION Document titled Initial Disclosures of Core Information instead of Notice of Deposition, attorney requested to re-file re #33 Notice to Take Deposition (tab)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC by Macy Derald Hanson on behalf of Marcus Green, Pamela D. Green (Hanson, Macy)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 9/13/2021 09:30 AM in Oxford Courtroom 3 West before Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers. (kbt)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/16/2021 at 10:00 AM in Oxford Visiting Magistrate Judge Chambers before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Discovery due by 3/26/2021. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 11/20/2020. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 2/5/2021. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 3/5/2021. Motions due by 4/9/2021. Settlement Conference set for 1/25/2021 at 1:30 PM in Oxford Visiting Magistrate Judge Chambers before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 8/13/2020. (jf)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 8/6/2020. Case Management Order to be entered. (jf)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 8/6/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Proposed Case Management Order and Confidential Settlement Memos due by 7/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 6/24/2020. (jf)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint,, by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Drinkwater, William)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying #17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 5/26/2020. (llw)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC's Rebuttal in Support of its Motion to Dismiss filed by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Drinkwater, William)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney James A. Haltom terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 8/27/19. (jcm)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney proposed order submitted by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Haltom, James)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (or, in the alternative, Motion for Leave of Court to Amend Pleadings) filed by Marcus Green, Pamela D. Green. (Hanson, Macy)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Responses due by 8/23/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 8/20/2019. (bds)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Marcus Green, Pamela D. Green. (Hanson, Macy)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney James A. Haltom. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 8/8/19. (jcm)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney James A. Haltom,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1706363) by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 TN Certificate of Good Standing, #2 KY Certificate of Good Standing) (Drinkwater, William)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Drinkwater, William)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Drinkwater, William)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, Jury Demand, filed by Pamela D. Green, Marcus Green. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Illustrative Credit Dispute Letter from SLS to Greens, #2 Exhibit 04.08.2019 Letter from SLS to Miss. A.G. Office re: Green Mortgage Account, #3 Exhibit Email-Chain Between Pamela Green and Gail Lowery of Miss. AG Office, #4 Affidavit Affidavit of Assurant Insurance VP, Ronald K. Wilson, #5 Affidavit Affidavit of Rust Consulting Project Manager, Patrick Hughes) (Hanson, Macy)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER finding as moot #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting #14 Motion for Leave to File. Amended Complaint due 7/19/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 7/1/19. (jcm)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint no later than July 19, 2019 by Marcus Green, Pamela D. Green. (Hanson, Macy)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Marcus Green, Pamela D. Green. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 6/25/2019. (bds)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Macy Derald Hanson on behalf of Marcus Green, Pamela D. Green (Hanson, Macy)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Responses due by 6/28/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 6/14/2019. (bds)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER finding as moot #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. No further written order will issue from the court. (no document attached) Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 6/13/2019. (bds) Modified on 6/17/2019 (jla).
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #8 Memorandum in Support by Marcus Green, Pamela D. Green. (Hanson, Macy)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #8 Memorandum in Support by Marcus Green, Pamela D. Green. (Hanson, Macy)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Drinkwater, William)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Drinkwater, William)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Assurant, Inc., American Security Insurance Company, Standard Guaranty Insurance Company, and Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company (jla) (Main Document 6 replaced with correct pdf on 5/28/2019) (jla). Modified on 5/28/2019 (jla).
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC answer due 5/31/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 5/9/19. (jcm)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Drinkwater, William)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Woods Drinkwater on behalf of Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC (Drinkwater, William)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to American Security Insurance Company, Assurant, Inc., Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, Standard Guaranty Insurance Company, Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company. Emailed to attorney for service. (jtm)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1668973, filed by Pamela D. Green, Marcus Green. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Illustrative Credit Dispute Letter from SLS to Greens, #2 Exhibit April 8, 2019, Letter re: Green Mortgage Account Letter to Miss. AG Offi, #3 Exhibit Email-Chain Between Pamela Green and Gail Lowery of Miss. AG Office, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (jtm)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Neal B. Biggers and Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. (jtm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green et al v. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Guaranty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Security Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assurant, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: William Woods Drinkwater
Represented By: James A. Haltom
Represented By: Kevin Polansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela D. Green
Represented By: Macy Derald Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Green
Represented By: Macy Derald Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?