DEARING v. MONROE COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT et al
Petitioner: Dewayne Dearing
Respondent: State of Mississippi and Monroe County Circuit Court
Case Number: 1:2019cv00096
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Monroe County Circuit Court, State of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A (Sentencing Order, Feb. 27, 2009, Monroe County Circuit Court Cause No. CR07-057-GM), #2 Exhibit Exhibit B (Previous Denials of Succ Habeas Petitions), #3 Exhibit Exhibit C (April 8, 2015 MSSC Denial of PCR), #4 Exhibit Exhibit D (Dec. 3, 2015 MSSC Denial of PCR), #5 Exhibit Exhibit E (April 26, 2018 MSSC Denial of PCR)) (Burch, Emily)
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #8 Order, Set Deadlines, Terminate Motions. (cr)
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #8 Order, Set Deadlines, Terminate Motions Acknowledgment filed by Monroe County Circuit Court, State of Mississippi. (Owens, Jerrolyn)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and directing the state to answer. Monroe County Circuit Court answer due 6/28/2019; State of Mississippi answer due 6/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 5/15/19. (cr)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Mississippi Southern; Case Number 5:19-cv-00040. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 14, 2019 Remark: Order #6 Transferring Case emailed to IT Department to electronically transfer case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi. Clerk will docket confirmation email when received from the Northern District of Mississippi. (LAT) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 5/15/2019.]
May 14, 2019 District Transfer Out to the District of The Northern District of Mississippi. (LAT) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 5/15/2019.]
May 14, 2019 ***Staff notes: Order #6 mailed to Dewayne Dearing #147239, M.D.O.C., 2999 U.S. Hwy 61 North, Woodville, MS 39669. (LAT) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 5/15/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK TO RESTRICT ACCESS TO PETITIONERS EXHIBIT ATTACHED TO THE PETITION AND TRANSFERRING THIS CAUSE TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF MISSISSIPPI. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 5/14/19 (LAT) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 5/15/2019.]
May 8, 2019 ***Staff notes - Screening by Pro Se Law Clerk. (AAO). [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 5/15/2019.]
May 8, 2019 ***Staff notes: Re-sent notice of assignment to Dewayne Dearing #147239 M.D.O.C., 2999 U.S. Hwy 61 North, Woodville, MS 39669 via USPS regular mail. (LAT) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 5/15/2019.]
May 8, 2019 ***Staff notes: NEF and notice of assignment sent to Dewayne Dearing #147239, Central MS Correctional Facility, 3B -A2 - D Zone - Bed 335, Post Office Box 88550, Pearl, MS 39208,via USPS regular mail. (LAT) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 5/15/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 ATTACHMENT-Notice of Assignment for Dewayne Dearing re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (LAT) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 5/15/2019.]
May 8, 2019 ***Set: JCG and NO_CMC Flags (LAT) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 5/15/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Columbia; Case Number 1:19-cv-00943. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 5/8/2019 (LAT). [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 5/15/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the Southern District of Mississippi..Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 5/7/2019. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/16/2019. (zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/8/2019.] [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 5/15/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DEWAYNE DEARING (zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/8/2019.] [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 5/15/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 3/27/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/8/2019.] [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 5/15/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEARING v. MONROE COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Mississippi
Represented By: Jerrolyn M. Owens
Represented By: Emily Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Monroe County Circuit Court
Represented By: Jerrolyn M. Owens
Represented By: Emily Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dewayne Dearing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?