Edwards v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston et al

Plaintiff: Bruce Edwards
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston and John Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv00101
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Settlement by Thomas Upton Reynolds, II on behalf of Bruce Edwards (Reynolds, Thomas)
June 10, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston answer due 6/28/2019. (jla)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/10/19. (bnd)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 7/22/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/10/19. (rtc)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Harris, Adam)
May 21, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/22/2019) (jwr).
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1681691, filed by Bruce Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Adam B. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Edwards
Represented By: Thomas Upton Reynolds, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?