Wright v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston

Plaintiff: Junior W. Wright
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, Fictitious Defendant A, Lincoln National Life Insurance Company and Fictitious Defendant B
Case Number: 1:2019cv00110
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Reissued as to Lincoln National Life Insurance Company; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 EXHIBIT re #8 Summons Returned Executed Green Card Return. (Beard, Gregory)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregory E. Beard on behalf of Junior W. Wright Lincoln National Life Insurance Company served on 7/16/2019. (Beard, Gregory)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregory E. Beard on behalf of Junior W. Wright Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston served on 7/15/2019. (Beard, Gregory) Modified on 7/25/2019 (jla).
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, Lincoln National Life Insurance Company; forwarded to Attorney for service. (jla)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 EXHIBIT re #2 Amended Complaint Exhibit D. (Beard, Gregory)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 EXHIBIT re #2 Amended Complaint Exhibit C. (Beard, Gregory)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 EXHIBIT re #2 Amended Complaint Exhibit B. (Beard, Gregory)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 EXHIBIT re #2 Amended Complaint . (Beard, Gregory)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, Lincoln National Life Insurance Company,, filed by Junior W. Wright. (Beard, Gregory)
June 5, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1686372, filed by Junior W. Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Appeal Letter with Enclosures, #2 Exhibit Denial of Appeal Letter, #3 Exhibit SSA Decision, #4 Exhibit SSA Hearing Transcript, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fictitious Defendant A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fictitious Defendant B
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Junior W. Wright
Represented By: Gregory E. Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?