Patten v. Tracie McCormick, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Elizabeth Patten
Defendant: John Does 1-10 and Tracie McCormick, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00115
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 7/9/19. (rtc)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Arthur D. Spratlin, Jr on behalf of Tracie McCormick, Inc. (Spratlin, Arthur)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Tracie McCormick, Inc.. (Smith, Margaret)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Casey Langston Lott on behalf of Elizabeth Patten Tracie McCormick, Inc. served on 6/17/2019. (Lott, Casey)
June 12, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Tracie McCormick, Inc. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1689381, filed by Elizabeth Patten. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patten v. Tracie McCormick, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracie McCormick, Inc.
Represented By: Arthur D. Spratlin, Jr.
Represented By: Margaret Zimmerman Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Patten
Represented By: Casey Langston Lott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?