Adams v. Turner et al
Plaintiff: Austin Adams
Defendant: Prentiss County, Mississippi, John and Jane Does 1-100, Christina Holley and Todd Turner
Case Number: 1:2019cv00123
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Christina Holley, Prentiss County, Mississippi, Todd Turner. (Dambrino, Robert)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER withdrawing #10 Motion for Default Judgment; granting #12 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 7/26/19. (jla)
July 25, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ashley Nobile Lane on behalf of All Defendants (Lane, Ashley)
July 25, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; Prentiss County, Mississippi waiver sent on 7/25/2019. (Mullins, Charles)
July 25, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; Todd Turner waiver sent on 7/25/2019. (Mullins, Charles)
July 25, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; Christina Holley waiver sent on 7/25/2019. (Mullins, Charles)
July 25, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Withdraw #9 Clerk's Entry of Default, #10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Prentiss County by Austin Adams. (Mullins, Charles)
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert J. Dambrino, III on behalf of All Defendants (Dambrino, Robert)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Prentiss County by Austin Adams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Affidavit) (Mullins, Charles)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Prentiss County, Mississippi (jla)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Reissued as to Christina Holley, Todd Turner; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Prentiss County, Mississippi by Austin Adams. (Mullins, Charles)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Past Due Answer as to Todd Turner, Christina Holley, and Prentiss County, Mississippi (jla)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Richard Mullins on behalf of Austin Adams Christina Holley served on 6/28/2019. (Mullins, Charles)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Richard Mullins on behalf of Austin Adams Todd Turner served on 6/28/2019. (Mullins, Charles)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Richard Mullins on behalf of Austin Adams Prentiss County, Mississippi served on 6/28/2019. (Mullins, Charles)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Christina Holley, Prentiss County, Mississippi, Todd Turner; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1692561, filed by Austin Adams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
June 21, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Turner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Adams
Represented By: Charles Richard Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prentiss County, Mississippi
Represented By: Ashley Nobile Lane
Represented By: Robert J. Dambrino, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-100
Represented By: Ashley Nobile Lane
Represented By: Robert J. Dambrino, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Holley
Represented By: Ashley Nobile Lane
Represented By: Robert J. Dambrino, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Turner
Represented By: Ashley Nobile Lane
Represented By: Robert J. Dambrino, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?