Barnett v. United Furniture Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cathy R. Barnett
Defendant: United Furniture Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00125
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Glen H Davidson
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 9/25/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Proposed Case Management Order and Confidential Settlement Memos due no later than 9/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 8/19/2019. (jf)
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA served on Mississippi Department of Employment Security on August 7, 2019 by Ronnie Lee Woodruff on behalf of Cathy R. Barnett. (Woodruff, Ronnie)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Cathy R. Barnett by John Samuel Hill on behalf of United Furniture Industries, Inc. (Hill, John)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Ronnie Lee Woodruff on behalf of Cathy R. Barnett of Intent to Serve Subpoena to MDES (Attachments: #1 Errata A - MDES Subpoena) (Woodruff, Ronnie)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jim D. Waide, III on behalf of Cathy R. Barnett United Furniture Industries, Inc. served on 7/6/2019. (Waide, Jim)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by United Furniture Industries, Inc.. (Hill, John)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. United Furniture Industries, Inc. answer due 7/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 7/2/19. (jcm)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint - State Court by United Furniture Industries, Inc.. (Hill, John)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to the Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B to the Complaint, #5 Exhibit Summons, #6 Exhibit Notice to State Court of Removal of Action to Federal Court, #7 Exhibit Notice of Removal) (Hill, John)
June 26, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Davidson and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against United Furniture Industries, Inc., filed by Cathy R. Barnett. (jla)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United Furniture Industries, Inc. from Lee County Circuit Court, case number CV19-057(W)L. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1693813) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by United Furniture Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnett v. United Furniture Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy R. Barnett
Represented By: Jim D. Waide, III
Represented By: Ronnie Lee Woodruff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Furniture Industries, Inc.
Represented By: John Samuel Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?