Wilemon Foundation, Inc. et al v. Wilemon
Plaintiff: Wilemon Foundation, Inc. and R. J. Wilemon, LLC
Defendant: Danny Wayne Wilemon
Case Number: 1:2019cv00136
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Glen H Davidson
2 Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses, First COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Danny Wayne Wilemon. (Moffett, T.)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - Danny Wayne Wilemon answer due 9/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 8/6/19. (jcm)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Danny Wayne Wilemon. (Moffett, T.)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by T. K. Moffett on behalf of Danny Wayne Wilemon (Moffett, T.)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed 7/25/19 by Arch W. Bullard on behalf of Wilemon Foundation, Inc. All Defendants. (Bullard, Arch) Modified on 8/1/2019 (tab).
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Debra M. Brown recused. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 7/26/19. (jla)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Michael P. Mills recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Debra M. Brown for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 7/26/19. (jla)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Sharion Aycock recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Michael P. Mills for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 7/24/19. (tab)
July 19, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Sharion Aycock and Magistrate Judge David Sanders. (tab)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Danny Wayne Wilemon. E-mailed to attorney for service. (tab)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1701006, filed by Wilemon Foundation, Inc., R. J. Wilemon, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilemon Foundation, Inc. et al v. Wilemon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilemon Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Arch W. Bullard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. J. Wilemon, LLC
Represented By: Arch W. Bullard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Wayne Wilemon
Represented By: T. K. Moffett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?