Geiger v. American Industrial Partners/Vertex Aerospace et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Geiger
Defendant: American Industrial Partners/Vertex Aerospace, Benjamin S. Burroughs and Vertex Aerospace, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00138
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Glen H Davidson
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 Plaintiff Pro Se's Response to Defendant's #9 Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint. (jwr)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney James Jeremy Tubb. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 9/13/19. (jcm)
September 11, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney James Jeremy Tubb,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1718060) by Vertex Aerospace, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Court Admissions, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Fijman, Mark)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Fijman, Mark)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Vertex Aerospace, LLC. (Fijman, Mark)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. (jwr)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark D. Fijman on behalf of Vertex Aerospace, LLC (Fijman, Mark)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Vertex Aerospace, LLC, Jury Demand, filed by Thomas Geiger. (jtm)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 8/9/19. (jtm)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed American Industrial Partners/Vertex Aerospace served on 7/26/2019. (tab)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Davidson and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jwr)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Returned to pro se plaintiff for service. (jwr)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number MSN300024432, filed by Thomas Geiger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geiger v. American Industrial Partners/Vertex Aerospace et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Industrial Partners/Vertex Aerospace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin S. Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vertex Aerospace, LLC
Represented By: James Jeremy Tubb
Represented By: Mark D. Fijman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?