Williams v. Navistar Defense, LLC
Plaintiff: Thomas (NMI) Williams
Defendant: Navistar Defense, LLC and The Greer Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00144
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Debra M Brown
2 Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Shane McLaughlin on behalf of Thomas (NMI) Williams The Greer Group, Inc. served on 8/28/2019. (McLaughlin, Richard)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - The Greer Group, Inc. answer due 10/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 9/17/19. (jcm)
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Amended Complaint (UNOPPOSED) by The Greer Group, Inc.. (Johnson, William)
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to The Greer Group, Inc. (jla)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - Navistar Defense, LLC answer due 9/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 9/12/19. (jcm)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Amended Complaint by Navistar Defense, LLC. (McShane, Marcia)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Shane McLaughlin on behalf of Thomas (NMI) Williams Navistar Defense, LLC served on 8/26/2019. (McLaughlin, Richard)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to The Greer Group, Inc.; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Reissued as to Navistar Defense, LLC; emailed to Attorney for service (jla)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, Jury Demand, filed by Thomas (NMI) Williams. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons - The Greer Group) (McLaughlin, Richard)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Sharion Aycock recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Debra M. Brown for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 08/01/2019. (jwr)
July 31, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Navistar Defense, LLC; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1705046, filed by Thomas (NMI) Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Navistar Defense, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navistar Defense, LLC
Represented By: Marcia Dawn McShane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Greer Group, Inc.
Represented By: William Mackin Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas (NMI) Williams
Represented By: Richard Shane McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?