Guyton v. Quality Healthcare LLC et al
Plaintiff: Natessa Guyton
Defendant: Jetuwan Brown, Quality Healthcare LLC and Verlencia R. Myers
Case Number: 1:2019cv00149
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nathaniel A. Bishop on behalf of Natessa Guyton (Bishop, Nathaniel)
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nathaniel A. Bishop on behalf of Natessa Guyton (Bishop, Nathaniel)
October 9, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #6 Summons Returned Executed, #7 Summons Returned Executed: Please refile and include the first page of each summons. (jwr)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nathaniel A. Bishop on behalf of Natessa Guyton Quality Healthcare LLC served on 9/27/2019. (Bishop, Nathaniel)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nathaniel A. Bishop on behalf of Natessa Guyton Jetuwan Brown served on 9/27/2019. (Bishop, Nathaniel)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Quality Healthcare LLC, Verlencia R. Myers, and Jetuwan Brown (jla)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Nathaniel A. Bishop. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 8/29/19. (def)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Nathaniel A. Bishop,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1713461) by Natessa Guyton. (Attachments: #1 Nathaniel Bishop Tennessee Certificate of Good Standing) (Ready, George)
August 15, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jetuwan Brown, Verlencia R. Myers, Quality Healthcare LLC.; emailed to Attorney for service (jla)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1709675, filed by Natessa Guyton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter, #2 Exhibit B - Guyton Consent to Join, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guyton v. Quality Healthcare LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jetuwan Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Healthcare LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verlencia R. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natessa Guyton
Represented By: George B. Ready
Represented By: Nathaniel A. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?