Whitt v. Gibson Corrugated, LLC
Plaintiff: Hannah Gray Whitt
Defendant: Gibson Corrugated, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00150
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Glen H Davidson
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 1/11/2021 09:30 AM in Oxford Courtroom 1 before Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson. (mga)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/14/2020 at 10:00 AM in Oxford Visiting Magistrate Judge Chambers before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Discovery due by 4/27/2020. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 12/30/2019. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 1/21/2020. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 2/21/2020. Motions due by 5/11/2020. Settlement Conference set for 4/1/2020 at 10:00 AM in Oxford Visiting Magistrate Judge Chambers before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 10/7/2019. (jf)
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production by Martin Joseph Regimbal on behalf of Gibson Corrugated, LLC to Plaintiff. (Regimbal, Martin)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 10/4/2019. Case Management Order to be entered. (jf)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Amended Pre-Discovery Disclosures by Martin Joseph Regimbal on behalf of Gibson Corrugated, LLC to Plaintiff. (Regimbal, Martin)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Pre-Discovery Disclosure Information by Martin Joseph Regimbal on behalf of Gibson Corrugated, LLC to Plaintiff. (Regimbal, Martin)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Pre-Discovery Disclosure of Core Information by Ronnie Lee Woodruff on behalf of Hannah Gray Whitt to Defendant. (Woodruff, Ronnie)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jim D. Waide, III on behalf of Hannah Gray Whitt Gibson Corrugated, LLC served on 8/12/2019. (Waide, Jim)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/4/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Proposed Case Management Order and Confidential Settlement Memos due no later than 9/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 8/23/2019. (jf)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Gibson Corrugated, LLC. (Regimbal, Martin)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Summons, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Notice of Filing Removal, #4 Exhibit D - Receipt for File Copy, #5 Exhibit E - State Court Certificates of Clerk) (Regimbal, Martin)
August 16, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Davidson and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Gibson Corrugated, LLC, filed by Hannah Gray Whitt. (jla)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Gibson Corrugated, LLC from Lee County Circuit Court, case number CV19-077(W)L. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1709898) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Gibson Corrugated, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint and Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitt v. Gibson Corrugated, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gibson Corrugated, LLC
Represented By: Martin Joseph Regimbal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannah Gray Whitt
Represented By: Jim D. Waide, III
Represented By: Ronnie Lee Woodruff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?