Smith v. BancorpSouth Bank
Plaintiff: Lindsay Jo Smith
Defendant: BancorpSouth Bank
Case Number: 1:2019cv00155
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Michael P Mills
2 Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 11/21/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Proposed Case Management Order and Confidential Settlement memos due by 11/14/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 10/16/2019. (jf)
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jim D. Waide, III on behalf of Lindsay Jo Smith BancorpSouth Bank served on 9/11/2019. (Waide, Jim)
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by BancorpSouth Bank. (Netterville, Alicia)
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mary Clay Morgan on behalf of BancorpSouth Bank (Morgan, Mary)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to BancorpSouth Bank (jla)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Debra M. Brown recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Michael P. Mills for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 9/10/19. (jla)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Debra M. Brown for all further proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 9/4/19. (tab)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Sharion Aycock recused. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 8/30/19. (tab)
August 26, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Sharion Aycock and Magistrate Judge David Sanders. (tab)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to BancorpSouth Bank. Forwarded to attorney for service. (tab)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1712936, filed by Lindsay Jo Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit B Right to Sue Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. BancorpSouth Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BancorpSouth Bank
Represented By: Mary Clay Morgan
Represented By: Alicia N. Netterville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsay Jo Smith
Represented By: Jim D. Waide, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?