Dixon v. Alcorn County, Mississippi et al
Plaintiff: Jone Marie Dixon
Defendant: Jimmy McGee and Alcorn County, Mississippi
Case Number: 1:2019cv00167
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay Pursuant to Local Rule 16 by Jimmy McGee. (Allen, William)
November 7, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Based on Qualified Immunity filed by Jimmy McGee. (Allen, William)
November 7, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Based on Qualified Immunity by Jimmy McGee. (Allen, William)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Alcorn County, Mississippi answer due 11/18/2019; Jimmy McGee answer due 11/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 10/29/19. (def)
October 23, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Alcorn County, Mississippi. (Griffith, Daniel)
October 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Katelyn Adele Riley on behalf of Jimmy McGee (Riley, Katelyn)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Proposed Case Management Order and Confidential Settlement Memos due by 11/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 10/22/2019. (jf)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Jimmy McGee. (Allen, William)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Alcorn County, Mississippi, Jimmy McGee. (Griffith, Daniel)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel J. Griffith on behalf of Alcorn County, Mississippi, Jimmy McGee (Griffith, Daniel)
October 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mary McKay Griffith on behalf of Alcorn County, Mississippi, Jimmy McGee (Griffith, Mary)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jim D. Waide, III on behalf of Jone Marie Dixon Jimmy McGee served on 10/1/2019. (Waide, Jim)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jim D. Waide, III on behalf of Jone Marie Dixon Alcorn County, Mississippi served on 9/26/2019. (Waide, Jim)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Alcorn County, Mississippi, Jimmy McGee. Forwarded to Attorney for Service. (tab) Modified on 9/12/2019 (tab).
September 12, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Sharion Aycock and Magistrate Judge David Sanders. (tab)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1718616, filed by Jone Marie Dixon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit B Right to Sue Letter, #3 Exhibit C Charge of Discrimination, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon v. Alcorn County, Mississippi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy McGee
Represented By: Daniel J. Griffith
Represented By: Mary McKay Griffith
Represented By: Katelyn Adele Riley
Represented By: William Robert Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcorn County, Mississippi
Represented By: Daniel J. Griffith
Represented By: Mary McKay Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jone Marie Dixon
Represented By: Jim D. Waide, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?