Manning v. Food Giant Supermarkets, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Marsha Manning
Defendant: Food Giant Supermarkets, Inc. and John Doe 1
Case Number: 1:2019cv00169
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Conference: Case Management Conference reset for 12/2/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosure Statement by Richard Lee Kimmel on behalf of Food Giant Supermarkets, Inc. to Plaintiff. (Kimmel, Richard)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand by Food Giant Supermarkets, Inc.. (Kimmel, Richard)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE STATEMENT of Food Giant Supermarkets, Inc.. (Kimmel, Richard)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket, #2 State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #3 State Court Complaint, #4 Summons, #5 Notice of Service, #6 Fee Bill) (Kimmel, Richard)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1. Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/24/19. (rtc)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admissions by Richard Lee Kimmel on behalf of Food Giant Supermarkets, Inc. to Plaintiff. (Kimmel, Richard)
September 18, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Marsha Manning. (jla)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Food Giant Supermarkets, Inc. from Lowndes County Circuit Court, case number 2019-0090-CV1H. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1720534) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Food Giant Supermarkets, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manning v. Food Giant Supermarkets, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Food Giant Supermarkets, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Lee Kimmel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marsha Manning
Represented By: James Roger Franks, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?