Wheelington v. VLRV, LLC
Plaintiff: James R. Wheelington
Defendant: Vanleigh RV, Inc. and VLRV, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00181
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Debra M Brown
2 Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER substituting Party, VLRV, LLC added. Vanleigh RV, Inc. terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 12/12/19. (jla)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference for March 19, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 12/12/19. (rtc)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/23/2020 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Discovery due by 6/12/2020. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 1/27/2020. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 3/12/2020. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 4/13/2020. Motions due by 7/6/2020. Settlement Conference set for 3/19/2020 02:00 PM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 12/12/19. (rtc)
December 12, 2019 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Case Management Conference held on 12/12/2019. (rtc)
December 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Richard Shane McLaughlin on behalf of James R. Wheelington to Defendant Vanleigh RV, Inc.. (McLaughlin, Richard)
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Conference: Case Management Conference reset for 12/12/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Shane McLaughlin on behalf of James R. Wheelington Vanleigh RV, Inc. served on 11/1/2019. (McLaughlin, Richard)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 12/16/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/6/19. (rtc)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Vanleigh RV, Inc.. (Allen, Andrew)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Sharion Aycock recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Debra M. Brown for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 10/21/19. (jla)
October 16, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Vanleigh RV, Inc.; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1729081, filed by James R. Wheelington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wheelington v. VLRV, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanleigh RV, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew C. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VLRV, LLC
Represented By: Andrew C. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R. Wheelington
Represented By: Richard Shane McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?