Mallory v. Municipal Court of Tupelo, MS
Plaintiff: Ricky Lynn Mallory
Defendant: Municipal Court of Tupelo, MS
Case Number: 1:2019cv00190
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Glen H Davidson
2 Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #11 Order Dismissing Case, #10 Memorandum Opinion. (jla)
November 20, 2019 Filing 11 FINAL JUDGMENT DISMISSING CASE dismissing case for failure to state a claim; counting as a STRIKE. CASE CLOSED. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 11/19/19. (jla)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER dismissing cause with prejudice for failure to state a claim. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 11/19/19. (jla)
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #5 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. (jla)
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 EXHIBIT re #1 Complaint. (jla)
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #4 Order Setting PSP Deadline and Notice of Intent to Continue Lawsuit. (jla)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 DECLINATION to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction; Case reassigned to Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson. District Judge Sharion Aycock no longer assigned to the case. (jla)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 10/29/19. (jla)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting PSP Deadline: PSP Forms due by 11/25/2019.. Signed by Clerk on 10/25/19. (jla)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ricky Lynn Mallory. (jla)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT challenging conditions of confinement,, filed by Ricky Lynn Mallory. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mallory v. Municipal Court of Tupelo, MS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Lynn Mallory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Municipal Court of Tupelo, MS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?