Hicks v. Martinrea Automotive Structures (USA), Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Aletha Louise Hicks
Defendant: Martinrea Automotive Structures (USA), Inc. and Lora Clark
Case Number: 1:2019cv00191
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Lora Clark, Martinrea Automotive Structures (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpts of Martha Evans depos transcript, #2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpts of Terry Hill depos transcript) (Watkins, Paul)
December 13, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Lora Clark, Martinrea Automotive Structures (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Pl's Response to RFP 8, #2 Exhibit 2 - Email, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Clark, #4 Exhibit 4 - Correction Action Policy) (Watkins, Paul)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time (until 12/17/19) to File a Reply re #8 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Replies now due by 12/17/2019. No further written order will issue from this Court. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 12/5/2019. (dbm)
December 4, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Lora Clark, Martinrea Automotive Structures (USA), Inc.. (Watkins, Paul)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time (until 12/13/19) to File a Response re #16 MOTION to Remand. Responses now due by 12/13/2019. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 12/3/2019. (dbm)
December 3, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Attorney Fees by Lora Clark, Martinrea Automotive Structures (USA), Inc.. (Watkins, Paul)
December 3, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #9 Memorandum in Support, #18 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,, #8 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Aletha Louise Hicks. (Woodruff, Ronnie)
December 3, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Aletha Louise Hicks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Curtis Curry v. HWCC-Tunica, Inc., Order on Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Deposition of Aletha Hicks in Patricia Tylers Workers Compensation case, #3 Exhibit 3 - Martinrea Application, #4 Exhibit 4 - Transcript of MDES Hearing, #5 Exhibit 5 - Job Description, #6 Exhibit 6 - Deposition of Robert Magers, #7 Exhibit 7 - Deposition of Gene Shields, #8 Exhibit 8 - Deposition of Lora Clark, #9 Exhibit 9 - Deposition of Tyangela Crawford, #10 Exhibit 10 - Deposition of Plaintiff, #11 Exhibit 11 - Raw Part with Clock Number, #12 Exhibit 12 - Deposition of Patricia Tyler, #13 Exhibit 13 - Corrective Action dated August 13, 2018, #14 Exhibit 14 - Henning Web Page, #15 Exhibit 15 - Notice of Workers Compensation Depositions, #16 Exhibit 16 - Email Chain Between Jones and Henning, #17 Exhibit 17 - Termination, #18 Exhibit 18 - Corrective Action Policy, #19 Exhibit 19 - Suspension, #20 Exhibit 20 - Initial Claim for Benefits, #21 Exhibit 21 - Notice of Nonmonetary Determination, #22 Exhibit 22 - ALJ Decision) (Woodruff, Ronnie)
November 22, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Aletha Louise Hicks. (Woodruff, Ronnie)
November 22, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand to State Court , MOTION for Attorney Fees by Aletha Louise Hicks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Answer, #3 Exhibit 3 - First Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 - Answer, #5 Exhibit 5 - MDES Hearing Transcript, #6 Exhibit 6 - Worker's Compensation Deposition, #7 Exhibit 7 - Deposition of Robert Magers, #8 Exhibit 8 - Deposition of Lora Clark, #9 Exhibit 9 - Email Chain, #10 Exhibit 10 - Deposition of Plaintiff, #11 Exhibit 11 - Henning Page, #12 Exhibit 12 - Termination Document, #13 Exhibit 13 - Notice of Deposition, #14 Exhibit 14 - Deposition of Tyangela Crawford) (Woodruff, Ronnie)
November 21, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/17/2020 10:30 AM in Oxford Visiting Magistrate Judge Chambers before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. (jla)
November 21, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #12 Notice of Conference. Status Conference is 10:30 a.m. (def)
November 21, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE Cancelling Case Management Conference. (def)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Cancelling CMC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 11/21/19. (def)
November 21, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Conference: Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/17/2020 10:30 PM in Oxford Visiting Magistrate Judge Chambers before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Plaintiff's counsel to initiate conference call. (def)
November 21, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders: Status Conference re CMC with Ron Woodruff and Brian Kruecher. Held on 11/21/2019. Order to follow (def)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time (until 12/5/19) to File a Response re #8 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Responses now due by 12/5/2019. No further written order will issue from this Court. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 11/18/2019. (no document attached) (dbm)
November 18, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 Memorandum in Support, #8 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Aletha Louise Hicks. (Woodruff, Ronnie)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Proposed Case Management Order and Confidential Settlement Memos due by 12/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 11/8/2019. (jf)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #8 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Lora Clark, Martinrea Automotive Structures (USA), Inc.. (Mallette, Pope)
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Lora Clark, Martinrea Automotive Structures (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Hicks Deposition Transcript, #3 Exhibit Hicks Deposition Ex. 7, #4 Exhibit Clark Deposition Transcript, #5 Exhibit Magers Deposition Transcript, #6 Exhibit Hicks Deposition Ex. 14, #7 Exhibit Shield Deposition Transcript, #8 Errata Graham Deposition Transcript, #9 Exhibit Hicks Deposition Ex. 8, #10 Exhibit Hicks Deposition Ex. 6, #11 Exhibit Hicks Deposition Ex. 9) (Mallette, Pope)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Brian A.Kruecher for the defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 11/4/2019. (def)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Brian A. Kreucher,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1734696) by Lora Clark, Martinrea Automotive Structures (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Watkins, Paul)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to State Court Complaint, filed in County Court of Lee County, Mississippi, by Lora Clark, Martinrea Automotive Structures (USA), Inc. (jtm)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Clerk Certificate, #2 Exhibit 2 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Answer and Defenses, #4 Exhibit 4 - Verified Application for Admissions, #5 Exhibit 5 - Notice of Issuance of SDT, #6 Exhibit 6 - Notice of Service, #7 Exhibit 7 - Supreme Court Clerk's Pro Hac Vice Statement, #8 Exhibit 8 - Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice, #9 Exhibit 9 - Agreed Order Allowing Pl to File First Amended Complaint, #10 Exhibit 10 - Pl's Notice of Issuance of SDT, #11 Exhibit 11 - Notice of Service, #12 Exhibit 12 - Notice of Service, #13 Exhibit 13 - SDT Return - MDES, #14 Exhibit 14 - First Amended Complaint, #15 Exhibit 15 - Summons Return on Martinrea, #16 Exhibit 16 - Summons Return on Clark, #17 Exhibit 17 - SDT Return - MDES, #18 Exhibit 18 - Notice of Service, #19 Exhibit 19 - Answer and Defenses to Amended Complaint, #20 Exhibit 20 - Notice of Service, #21 Exhibit 21 - Notice of Issuance of SDT, #22 Exhibit 22 - Notice to Take Deposition, #23 Exhibit 23 - Notice to Take Deposition, #24 Exhibit 24 - Agreed Order, #25 Exhibit 25 - Deposition Subpoena, #26 Exhibit 26 - SDT Return - New Process Steel, #27 Exhibit 27 - Notice of Service) (Watkins, Paul)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE STATEMENT of Martinrea Automotive Structures (USA), Inc.. (Watkins, Paul)
October 25, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Lora Clark, Martinrea Automotive Structures (USA), Inc., filed by Aletha Louise Hicks. (jla)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lora Clark, Martinrea Automotive Structures (USA), Inc. from County Court of Lee County, case number CV19-425. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1732487) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Lora Clark, Martinrea Automotive Structures (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hicks v. Martinrea Automotive Structures (USA), Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aletha Louise Hicks
Represented By: Ronnie Lee Woodruff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martinrea Automotive Structures (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Paul Bowie Watkins, Jr.
Represented By: Pope S. Mallette
Represented By: Brian A. Kreucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lora Clark
Represented By: Paul Bowie Watkins, Jr.
Represented By: Pope S. Mallette
Represented By: Brian A. Kreucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?