Haynes v. Winston Plywood and Veneer, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Keely R. Haynes
Defendant: Winston Plywood and Veneer, LLC, Controller Tanya Dinning, CFO Patty Burkland and Chris Bennett
Case Number: 1:2019cv00193
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Eugene Moore on behalf of Keely R. Haynes Winston Plywood and Veneer, LLC served on 12/12/2019. (Moore, Carlos)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Eugene Moore on behalf of Keely R. Haynes Tanya Dinning served on 12/12/2019. (Moore, Carlos)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Eugene Moore on behalf of Keely R. Haynes Chris Bennett served on 12/12/2019. (Moore, Carlos)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Winston Plywood and Veneer, LLC; CFO Patty Burkland; and Controller Tanya Dinning (jla)
October 28, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1733236, filed by Keely R. Haynes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haynes v. Winston Plywood and Veneer, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winston Plywood and Veneer, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Controller Tanya Dinning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CFO Patty Burkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keely R. Haynes
Represented By: Carlos Eugene Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?