United States of America v. Young
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Randy D. Young
Case Number: 1:2019cv00196
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATED CONSENT DECREE AND FINAL JUDGMENT. CASE CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 11/12/19. (jla)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Entry of Stipulated Consent Decree and Final Judgment. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 11/12/19. (jla)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION Entry of Stipulated Consent Decree and Final Judgment by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit signed Consent Decree) (Webster, Joseph)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Harland Webster on behalf of United States of America Randy D. Young served on 11/6/2019. (Webster, Joseph)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Randy D. Young. Emailed to attorney for service. (jtm)
November 1, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy D. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Joseph Harland Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?