The State of Mississippi v. Google, LLC
Plaintiff: The State of Mississippi
Defendant: Google, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00220
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Google, LLC answer due 2/7/2020. (jla)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond by February 7, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 1/27/19. (def)
January 24, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint by Google, LLC. (Krutz, Fred)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Attorney Peter G. Neiman. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 12/30/19. (jcm)
December 24, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Peter G. Neiman,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1753719) by Google, LLC. (Krutz, Fred)
December 23, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Google, LLC answer due 1/24/2020. No document attached. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 12/23/19. (def)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER denying as premature #17 Motion Set Briefing Schedule for Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. The briefing schedule as to all motions will be governed by the Uniform Local Civil Rules. No further written Order will issue from this Court.Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 12/23/2019 (no document attached). (sko)
December 23, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #16 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Attorney to refile document using proper event, Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (jtm)
December 20, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Google, LLC. (Krutz, Fred)
December 20, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND by Google, LLC. (Krutz, Fred)
December 20, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Fred Krutz, III on behalf of Google, LLC (Krutz, Fred)
December 19, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Original State Court Complaint, filed in Chancery Court of Lowndes County, Mississippi on 02/14/2018 by Google, LLC. (jtm) Modified on 12/23/2019 (jtm).
December 18, 2019 Filing 14 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 120 - Attorney Generals Motion for Trial Setting and Scheduling Order, #2 Exhibit 121 - Agreed Order Setting Hearing, #3 Exhibit 122 - Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Depositions, #4 Exhibit 123 - Plaintiffs Sealed Response to Googles Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #5 Exhibit 124 - Googles Sealed Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel, #6 Exhibit 125 - Agreed Order Setting Hearing, #7 Exhibit 126 - Agreed Order Setting Hearing, #8 Exhibit 127 - Order Denying Googles Motion to Compel, #9 Exhibit 128 - Agreed Order Setting Trial and Scheduling Order, #10 Exhibit 129 - Agreed Order Setting Hearing, #11 Exhibit 130 - First Amended Complaint) (Krutz, Fred)
December 18, 2019 Filing 13 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 111 - Affidavit of Zach Yeskel, #2 Exhibit 111-1 - Exhibit List to Yeskel Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 111-2 - Exhibit A to Yeskel Affidavit, #4 Exhibit 113-9 - Exhibit B to Yeskel Affidavit, #5 Exhibit 116 - Exhibit C to Yeskel Affidavit, #6 Exhibit 117 - Exhibit E to Yeskel Affidavit, #7 Exhibit 118 - Exhibit F to Yeskel Affidavit, #8 Exhibit 119 - Exhibit D to Yeskel Affidavit) (Krutz, Fred)
December 18, 2019 Filing 12 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 101 - Second Amended Notice of Taking 30(b)(5) and (6) Video Deposition of Google, #2 Exhibit 102 - Second Amended Notice of Taking 30(b)(5) and (6) Video Deposition of Google, #3 Exhibit 103 - Second Amended Notice of Taking 30(b)(5) and (6) Video Deposition of Google, #4 Exhibit 104 - Second Amended Notice of Taking 30(b)(5) and (6) Video Deposition of Google, #5 Exhibit 105 - Second Amended Notice of Taking 30(b)(5) and (6) Video Deposition of Google, #6 Exhibit 106 - Googles Reply in Support of its Motion for Protective Order, #7 Exhibit 107 - Notice of Hearing on Plaintiffs First Sealed Motion to Compel, #8 Exhibit 108 - Googles Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #9 Exhibit 109 - Memorandum in Support of Googles Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #10 Exhibit 110 - Statement of Uncontested Facts in Support of Googles Motion for Partial Summary Judgment) (Krutz, Fred)
December 18, 2019 Filing 11 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit) (Krutz, Fred)
December 18, 2019 Filing 10 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 61 - Motion for Admission of Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit 62 - Clerks Pro Hac Vice Statement, #3 Exhibit 63 - Clerks Pro Hac Vice Statement, #4 Exhibit 64 - Notice of Service of Googles Responses to Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents, #5 Exhibit 65 - Notice of Service of Googles Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents, #6 Exhibit 66 - Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice, #7 Exhibit 67 - Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice, #8 Exhibit 68 - Notice of Service of Attorney Generals Responses to Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents, #9 Exhibit 69 - Entry of Appearance, #10 Exhibit 70 - Entry of Appearance, #11 Exhibit 71 - Motion to Withdraw as Counsel, #12 Exhibit 72 - Order Denying Googles Motion for Reconsideration, #13 Exhibit 73 - Order Denying Motion to Withdraw as Counsel, #14 Exhibit 74 - Notice of Service of Attorney Generals Second Set of Discovery Requests, #15 Exhibit 75 - Notice of Service of Attorney Generals Second Set of Discovery Requests, #16 Exhibit 76 - Plaintiffs Motion to Compel, #17 Exhibit 77 - Notice of Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion to Compel, #18 Exhibit 78 - Googles Motion to Compel, #19 Exhibit 79 - Agreed Order Setting Hearing re Motions to Compel, #20 Exhibit 80 - Googles Opposition to Attorney Generals Motion to Compel) (Krutz, Fred)
December 18, 2019 Filing 9 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 41 - Defendants Unopposed Motion for Additional Time to Answer the Complaint, #2 Exhibit 42 - Googles Emergency Motion to Stay, #3 Exhibit 43 - Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Additional Time to Answer Complaint, #4 Exhibit 44 - Defendants Second Unopposed Motion for Additional Time to Answer the Complaint, #5 Exhibit 45 - Notice of Appearance, #6 Exhibit 46 - Order Granting Motion for Additional Time to Answer Complaint, #7 Exhibit 47 - Plaintiffs Response to Googles Emergency Motion to Stay, #8 Exhibit 48 - Notice of Appearance, #9 Exhibit 49 - Googles Reply in Support of Emergency Motion to Stay, #10 Exhibit 50 - Agreed Order Setting Hearing, #11 Exhibit 51- Motion to Withdraw as Counsel, #12 Exhibit 52 - Order Granting Motion to Stay, #13 Exhibit 53 - Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel, #14 Exhibit 54 - Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel, #15 Exhibit 55 - Corrected Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel, #16 Exhibit 56 - Order Denying Petition for Interlocutory Appeal and Motion for Stay, #17 Exhibit 57 - Googles Answer and Defenses to Complaint, #18 Exhibit 58 - Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Respond, #19 Exhibit 59 - Notice of Service of Attorney Generals Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents, #20 Exhibit 60 - Motion for Admission of Counsel Pro Hac Vice) (Krutz, Fred)
December 18, 2019 Filing 8 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 21 - Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response, #2 Exhibit 22 - Agreed Order Granting Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Extension, #3 Exhibit 23 - Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #4 Exhibit 24 - Clerks Pro Hac Vice Statement, #5 Exhibit 25 - Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice, #6 Exhibit 26 - Plaintiffs Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, #7 Exhibit 27 - Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, #8 Exhibit 28 - Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants Motion to Dismiss, #9 Exhibit 29 - Motion for Admission of Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #10 Exhibit 30 - Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #11 Exhibit 31 - Clerks Pro Hac Vice Statement, #12 Exhibit 32 - Clerks Pro Hac Vice Statement, #13 Exhibit 33 - Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice, #14 Exhibit 34 - Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice, #15 Exhibit 35 - Agreed Order Setting Hearing on Motion to Dismiss, #16 Exhibit 36 - Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Extension to File Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, #17 Exhibit 37 - Agreed Order Granting Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Extension to File Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, #18 Exhibit 38 - Plaintiffs Motion for Extension to File Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, #19 Exhibit 39 - Order Granting Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Extension to File Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, #20 Exhibit 40 - Opinion and Order on Defendants Motion to Dismiss) (Krutz, Fred)
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons Issued to Google, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summons Returned Executed, #5 Exhibit 5 - Entry of Appearance, #6 Exhibit 6 - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #7 Exhibit 7 - Entry of Appearance, #8 Exhibit 8 - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #9 Exhibit 9 - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #10 Exhibit 10 - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #11 Exhibit 11 - Clerks Pro Hac Vice Statement, #12 Exhibit 12 - Clerks Pro Hac Vice Statement, #13 Exhibit 13 - Clerks Pro Hac Vice Statement, #14 Exhibit 14 - Clerks Pro Hac Vice Statement, #15 Exhibit 15 - Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice, #16 Exhibit 16 - Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice, #17 Exhibit 17 - Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice, #18 Exhibit 18 - Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice, #19 Exhibit 19 - Google Motion to Dismiss, #20 Exhibit 20 - Google Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss) (Krutz, Fred)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Blake Roberts for the defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 12/12/19. (def)
December 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel J. Mulholland on behalf of Google, LLC (Mulholland, Daniel)
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 EXHIBIT re #3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Blake Roberts,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1746943) . (Krutz, Fred)
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Blake Roberts,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1746943) by Google, LLC. (Krutz, Fred)
December 5, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Sharion Aycock and Magistrate Judge David Sanders. (tab)
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Google, LLC, filed by The State of Mississippi. (tab)
December 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Google, LLC from Chancery Court of Lowndes County, Mississippi, case number 17-22-B. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1746538) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Google, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The State of Mississippi v. Google, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, LLC
Represented By: Fred Krutz, III
Represented By: Blake Roberts
Represented By: Daniel J. Mulholland
Represented By: Peter G. Neiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Mississippi
Represented By: John Wimberly Kitchens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?