Mincy v. Delta Dental Plans Association et al
Plaintiff: Dr. Catherine J. Mincy
Defendant: Delta Dental of Wisconsin, Delta Dental Plans Association, Delta Dental Plan of West Virginia, Inc., Delta Dental of the District of Columbia, Delta Dental of Puerto Rico, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Oklahoma, Delta Dental of Colorado, Hawaii Dental Service, Delta Dental of Nebraska, Delta Dental Plan of New Hampshire, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Idaho, Inc., Delta Dental of Virginia, Delta Dental of New York, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Arkansas, Inc., Delta Dental of California, Delta Dental Plan of Minnesota, Delta Dental Plan of Vermont, Inc., Delta Dental of North Carolina, Delta Dental of Pennsylvania, Arizona Dental Insurance Service, Inc., Delta Dental of Iowa, Delta Dental of Illinois, Delta Dental Plan of Ohio, Inc., Delta Dental Insurance Company, Delta Dental of Missouri, Dental Service of Massachusetts, Inc., Delta Dental of Rhode Island, Delta Dental of Kansas, Inc., Delta Dental of Delaware, Inc., Oregon Dental Service, Delta Dental Plan of New Mexico, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Michigan, Inc., Delta Dental of South Dakota, Delta Dental of Washington, Delta Dental Plan of Wyoming, Delta Dental Plan of Indiana, Inc., DeltaUSA, Maine Dental Service Corp., Delta Dental of Kentucky, Inc., Delta Dental of New Jersey, Inc. and Delta Dental of Tennessee, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00227
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney William A. Isaacson,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1769558) by Catherine J. Mincy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Lott, Casey)
February 6, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Melissa Felder Zappala,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1769556) by Catherine J. Mincy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Lott, Casey)
February 6, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Edward H. Takashima,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1769550) by Catherine J. Mincy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing) (Lott, Casey)
February 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Casey Langston Lott on behalf of Catherine J. Mincy Stipulation and Proposed Order Staying Action Pending Resolution of Proceedings Before the JPML, and Resolving Motion to Stay (Lott, Casey)
January 17, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #5 MOTION to Stay PROCEEDINGS PENDING A RULING FROM THE JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION ON PENDING MOTION FOR TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1407 filed by Arizona Dental Insurance Service, Inc., Delta Dental Insurance Company, Delta Dental Plan of Arkansas, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Idaho, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Indiana, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Michigan, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Minnesota, Delta Dental Plan of New Hampshire, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of New Mexico, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Ohio, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Oklahoma, Delta Dental Plan of Vermont, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of West Virginia, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Wyoming, Delta Dental Plans Association, Delta Dental of California, Delta Dental of Colorado, Delta Dental of Delaware, Inc., Delta Dental of Illinois, Delta Dental of Iowa, Delta Dental of Kansas, Inc., Delta Dental of Kentucky, Inc., Delta Dental of Missouri, Delta Dental of Nebraska, Delta Dental of New Jersey, Inc., Delta Dental of New York, Inc., Delta Dental of North Carolina, Delta Dental of Pennsylvania, Delta Dental of Puerto Rico, Inc., Delta Dental of Rhode Island, Delta Dental of South Dakota, Delta Dental of Tennessee, Inc., Delta Dental of Virginia, Delta Dental of Washington, Delta Dental of Wisconsin, Delta Dental of the District of Columbia, DeltaUSA, Dental Service of Massachusetts, Inc., Hawaii Dental Service, Maine Dental Service Corp., Oregon Dental Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Initial Case Management Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Consolidated Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - JPML Motion to Transfer, #4 Exhibit 4 - Defendants' Response to JPML Motion, #5 Exhibit 5 - Order re Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings, #6 Exhibit 6 - Schwartz Order Regarding Stay, #7 Exhibit 7 - Email from B. Miller to M. Zappala, #8 Exhibit 8 - Lutins & Benitez Stipulation, #9 Exhibit 9 - Braunstein Stipulation, #10 Exhibit 10 - Email Chain) (Crawford, John)
January 17, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay PROCEEDINGS PENDING A RULING FROM THE JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION ON PENDING MOTION FOR TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1407 by Arizona Dental Insurance Service, Inc., Delta Dental Insurance Company, Delta Dental Plan of Arkansas, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Idaho, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Indiana, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Michigan, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Minnesota, Delta Dental Plan of New Hampshire, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of New Mexico, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Ohio, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Oklahoma, Delta Dental Plan of Vermont, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of West Virginia, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Wyoming, Delta Dental Plans Association, Delta Dental of California, Delta Dental of Colorado, Delta Dental of Delaware, Inc., Delta Dental of Illinois, Delta Dental of Iowa, Delta Dental of Kansas, Inc., Delta Dental of Kentucky, Inc., Delta Dental of Missouri, Delta Dental of Nebraska, Delta Dental of New Jersey, Inc., Delta Dental of New York, Inc., Delta Dental of North Carolina, Delta Dental of Pennsylvania, Delta Dental of Puerto Rico, Inc., Delta Dental of Rhode Island, Delta Dental of South Dakota, Delta Dental of Tennessee, Inc., Delta Dental of Virginia, Delta Dental of Washington, Delta Dental of Wisconsin, Delta Dental of the District of Columbia, DeltaUSA, Dental Service of Massachusetts, Inc., Hawaii Dental Service, Maine Dental Service Corp., Oregon Dental Service. (Crawford, John)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING TIME TO RESPOND TO CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 1/16/2020. (def)
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brent Hardy Hazzard on behalf of Catherine J. Mincy (Hazzard, Brent)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
December 13, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1750243, filed by Catherine J. Mincy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mincy v. Delta Dental Plans Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Wisconsin
Represented By: John Adam Crawford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plans Association
Represented By: John Adam Crawford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of West Virginia, Inc.
Represented By: John Adam Crawford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of the District of Columbia
Represented By: John Adam Crawford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Puerto Rico, Inc.
Represented By: John Adam Crawford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of Oklahoma
Represented By: John Adam Crawford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Colorado
Represented By: John Adam Crawford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaii Dental Service
Represented By: John Adam Crawford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Nebraska
Represented By: John Adam Crawford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of New Hampshire, Inc.
Represented By: John Adam Crawford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of Idaho, Inc.
Represented By: John Adam Crawford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Virginia
Represented By: John Adam Crawford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of New York, Inc.
Represented By: John Adam Crawford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of Arkansas, Inc.
Represented By: John Adam Crawford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of California
Represented By: John Adam Crawford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of Minnesota
Represented By: John Adam Crawford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of Vermont, Inc.
Represented By: John Adam Crawford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of North Carolina
Represented By: John Adam Crawford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Pennsylvania
Represented By: John Adam Crawford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Dental Insurance Service, Inc.
Represented By: John Adam Crawford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Iowa
Represented By: John Adam Crawford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Illinois
Represented By: John Adam Crawford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of Ohio, Inc.
Represented By: John Adam Crawford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Insurance Company
Represented By: John Adam Crawford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Missouri
Represented By: John Adam Crawford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dental Service of Massachusetts, Inc.
Represented By: John Adam Crawford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Rhode Island
Represented By: John Adam Crawford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Kansas, Inc.
Represented By: John Adam Crawford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Delaware, Inc.
Represented By: John Adam Crawford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon Dental Service
Represented By: John Adam Crawford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of New Mexico, Inc.
Represented By: John Adam Crawford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of Michigan, Inc.
Represented By: John Adam Crawford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of South Dakota
Represented By: John Adam Crawford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Washington
Represented By: John Adam Crawford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of Wyoming
Represented By: John Adam Crawford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of Indiana, Inc.
Represented By: John Adam Crawford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeltaUSA
Represented By: John Adam Crawford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maine Dental Service Corp.
Represented By: John Adam Crawford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Kentucky, Inc.
Represented By: John Adam Crawford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of New Jersey, Inc.
Represented By: John Adam Crawford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Tennessee, Inc.
Represented By: John Adam Crawford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Catherine J. Mincy
Represented By: Casey Langston Lott
Represented By: Brent Hardy Hazzard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?