Estate of Jim W. Benjamin et al v. Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC
Plaintiff: Estate of Jim W. Benjamin, Brett Benjamin and Scott Benjamin
Defendant: Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00001
Filed: January 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Glen H Davidson
2 Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/27/2020. (rtc)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/11/2021 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Discovery due by 10/19/2020. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 3/27/2020. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 7/20/2020. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 8/20/2020. Motions due by 11/9/2020. Settlement Conference set for 7/22/2020 02:00 PM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/27/2020. (rtc)
February 27, 2020 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Case Management Conference held on 2/27/2020. (rtc)
February 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Conference: Case Management Conference reset for 2/27/2020 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
February 12, 2020 NOTICE Cancelling Case Management Conference set for 2/13/2020. CMC to be rescheduled. NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (rtc)
January 23, 2020 Filing 7 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Chancery Court Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit Docket Entry 2, #3 Exhibit Docket Entry 3, #4 Exhibit Docket Entry 4, #5 Exhibit Docket Entry 5, #6 Exhibit Docket Entry 6, #7 Exhibit Docket Entry 7, #8 Exhibit Docket Entry 8, #9 Exhibit Docket Entry 9) (Steindorff, Amelia)
January 7, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC. (Steindorff, Amelia)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Sharion Aycock recused. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 1/3/2020. (jwr)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 2/13/2020 11:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 1/2/2020. (rtc)
January 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Amelia Killebrew Steindorff on behalf of Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC To Plaintiff of Removal (Steindorff, Amelia)
January 2, 2020 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Sharion Aycock and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (tab)
January 2, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, filed by Estate of Jim W. Benjamin, Scott Benjamin, Brett Benjamin. (tab)
January 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC from Chancery Court of Alcorn County, Mississippi, case number CV2019-682-02-B. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1754746) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B Property Description, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Jim W. Benjamin et al v. Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Jim W. Benjamin
Represented By: Arch W. Bullard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Benjamin
Represented By: Arch W. Bullard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Benjamin
Represented By: Arch W. Bullard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Amelia Killebrew Steindorff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?