Russell v. Wisniewski, M.D. et al
Plaintiff: Mandie Russell
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc., Qualitest Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis PLC, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Bruce Medical Clinic, Endo Health Solutions Inc., John Does 1-10, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Family Medical Care, Actavis, Inc., Pearson's Discount Drugs, LLC, Walter Pearson, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Tom Longest, Jr, M.D., Allergan PLC, Peter Wisniewski, M.D., Watson Laboratories, Inc. and Actavis, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00021
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Grant Armistead on behalf of Pearson's Discount Drugs, LLC, Walter Pearson (Armistead, William)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Corrected ORDER re #14 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 3/30/20. (def)
March 19, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE by Stephen Lee Thomas on behalf of Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc. re #14 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Thomas, Stephen)
March 3, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kimberly Anne Simoes on behalf of Mandie Russell (Simoes, Kimberly)
February 28, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED ANSWER to #2 Complaint - State Court by Pearson's Discount Drugs, LLC, Walter Pearson. (Dillard, Lamar)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due thirty days from transfer or remand of action. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 2/25/2020. (def)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Pearson's Discount Drugs, LLC answer due 3/5/2020; Walter Pearson answer due 3/5/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 2/25/2020. (def)
February 24, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Pearson's Discount Drugs, LLC, Walter Pearson. (Dillard, Lamar)
February 17, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Stephen Lee Thomas on behalf of Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc. of Conditional Transfer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. MDL Conditional Transfer Order) (Thomas, Stephen)
February 14, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand by Peter Wisniewski, M.D.. (Sproule, Robert)
February 13, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint - State Court by Pearson's Discount Drugs, LLC, Walter Pearson. (Dillard, Lamar)
February 12, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lamar Bradley Dillard on behalf of Pearson's Discount Drugs, LLC, Walter Pearson (Dillard, Lamar)
February 12, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint - State Court or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Allergan PLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Thomas, Stephen)
February 12, 2020 Filing 6 EXHIBIT re #4 State Court Record - Removal,,,,,,, Attachment #19 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal. (Thomas, Stephen)
February 12, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to State Court Complaint (filed in State Court, see Doc #4 ) by Tom Longest, Jr, M.D.. (jla)
February 12, 2020 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 State Court Complaint, #4 Summons Issued on Qualitest Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Bruce Family Medical Clinic, Family Medical Care, Par Pharmaceutical Holdings, Inc., Peter Wisniewski, M.D., Walter S. Pearson, Pearson's Discount Drugs, LLC, Tom Longest, Jr., M.D., and Watson Pharma, Inc., #5 Motion for Extension of Time for Service of Process, #6 Summons Issued on Watson Laboratories, Inc., #7 Summons Issued on Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Qualitest Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Par Pharmaceutical Holdings, Inc., and Pearson's Discount Drugs, LLC, #8 Summons Issued on Peter Wisniewski, M.D., Tom Longest, Jr., M.D., and Walter S. Pearson, #9 Subpoena Duces Tecum Issued on Tom Longest, Jr., M.D., #10 Subpoena Duces Tecum Issued on Peter Wisniewski, M.D., #11 Order Extending Time to Serve Process, #12 Notice of Withdrawal of Tom B. Longest, Jr., M.D.'s Motion to Dismiss, #13 Answer and Defenses of Tom Bruce Longest, Jr., M.D., #14 Notice and Motion to Dismiss Tom Bruce Longest, Jr., M.D., #15 Notice and Motion to Dismiss Bruce Family Medical Clinic, #16 Entry of Appearance of Bradley Dillard (Mitchell McNutt) for Pearson Discount Drugs, LLC and Walter Pearson, #17 Request for Copy of Docket by M. Whitaker (Thomson Reuters), #18 Request for Copy of Complete File by Huie, Fernambucq & Stewart, LLP) (Thomas, Stephen)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Stephen Lee Thomas on behalf of Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc. of Potential Tag-Along (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. MDL Notice of Potential Tag-Along) (Thomas, Stephen)
February 6, 2020 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jwr)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Mandie Russell. (jwr)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Actavis, LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. from Circuit Court of Chickasaw County, case number 02019-056H. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1769343) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Actavis, LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Process and Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell v. Wisniewski, M.D. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Represented By: J. Carter Thompson, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Deucalion Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: J. Carter Thompson, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Deucalion Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Lee Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualitest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Represented By: Stephen Lee Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: J. Carter Thompson, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Deucalion Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Medical Clinic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: J. Carter Thompson, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Deucalion Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Lee Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Medical Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Lee Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pearson's Discount Drugs, LLC
Represented By: Lamar Bradley Dillard
Represented By: William Grant Armistead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Pearson
Represented By: Lamar Bradley Dillard
Represented By: William Grant Armistead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Simon T. Bailey
Represented By: Stephen Lee Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Longest, Jr, M.D.
Represented By: Tommie Gregory Williams, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Represented By: Stephen Lee Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Wisniewski, M.D.
Represented By: Robert Gordon Sproule, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Simon T. Bailey
Represented By: Stephen Lee Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, LLC
Represented By: Simon T. Bailey
Represented By: Stephen Lee Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mandie Russell
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Simoes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?