PVT, LLC v. AmGuard Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: PVT, LLC and PVT, LLC doing business as Pizza vs Tacos
Defendant: AmGuard Insurance Company and John Does 1-3
Case Number: 1:2020cv00135
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Glen H Davidson
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AMENDED ORDER re #16 Order on Motion to Stay. Plaintiff to respond to the motion to dismiss within fourteen days after the decision on the motion to remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 8/5/20. (def)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 7/28/20. (def)
July 23, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by PVT, LLC. (Spencer, William)
July 17, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay by PVT, LLC. (Greer, Michael)
July 16, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court and memorandum filed by AmGuard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration, #2 Exhibit B-Executive Order 20-018, #3 Exhibit C-Executive Order 1507, #4 Exhibit D-Transcript- Social Life v. Sentinel, #5 Exhibit E-Press Release) (Webb, Dan)
July 16, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by AmGuard Insurance Company. (Webb, Dan)
July 16, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by AmGuard Insurance Company. (Webb, Dan)
July 14, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by AmGuard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit B - 4/24/20 Letter, #3 Exhibit C - 5/14/20 Letter) (Webb, Dan)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer AmGuard Insurance Company answer due 8/10/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 7/14/20. (jla)
July 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Collins Spencer, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Spencer, William)
July 6, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by PVT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Motion to Remand) (Greer, Michael)
July 6, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court ; attorney to refile correct pdf (jla)
July 2, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Greer, Michael) Modified on 7/6/2020 (jla).
July 2, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by PVT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Motion to Remand) (Greer, Michael)
July 1, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint - State Court by AmGuard Insurance Company. (Webb, Dan)
June 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Dan W. Webb on behalf of AmGuard Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,,,, Supplement of Complete Exhibit "E" (The Policy) to Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E- Complete Exhibit E to Notice of Removal (Certified Policy) (Webb, Dan)
June 25, 2020 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Davidson and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against AmGuard Insurance Company, John Does 1-3, filed by PVT, LLC. (jla)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AmGuard Insurance Company from County Court of Lee County, case number CV2020-000548. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1822059) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by AmGuard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - CT Corp Notice of Service, #3 Exhibit C - MS SOS Info, #4 Exhibit D - PA SOS Info, #5 Exhibit E - Policy Declarations, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PVT, LLC v. AmGuard Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmGuard Insurance Company
Represented By: Brandi Elizabeth Soper
Represented By: Dan W. Webb
Represented By: Roechelle R. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PVT, LLC
Represented By: Michael D. Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PVT, LLC doing business as Pizza vs Tacos
Represented By: Michael D. Greer
Represented By: William Collins Spencer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?