University Management, Inc. et al v. State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Grill Tupelo, LLC, BBC, LLC and Columbus Deli, Inc.
Defendant: State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company, State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company, State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company doing business as State Auto Insurance Companies and State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company doing business as State Auto Insurance Companies
Counter Defendant: University Management, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00138
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Debra M Brown
2 Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 112 FINAL JUDGMENT. CASE CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 3/15/2022. (jwr)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MEMORANDUM OPINION granting #51 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #53 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot #75 Motion in Limine; denying as moot #77 Motion in Limine; denying as moot #79 Motion in Limine; denying as moot #81 Motion in Limine; denying as moot #83 Motion in Limine; denying as moot #93 Motion to Bifurcate. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 3/15/2022. (jwr)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 110 NOTICE by Michael O'Mara Gwin on behalf of State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company of Issuance of Mandate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Terry Black's Mandate) (Gwin, Michael)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #53 MOTION for Summary Judgment (supplemental brief). (Brady, John)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Supplement to Motion re #51 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant's Supplemental Brief filed by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Gwin, Michael)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER. Supplemental briefs due by 1/20/2022 re #51 , #53 Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 1/13/2022. (jtm)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 106 NOTICE CONTINUING MVD Jury Trial set for 3/7/2022 Until Further Notice (jtm)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Debra M. Brown: Telephonic Status Conference held on 1/12/2022. (jla)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE of Conference: Status Conference set for 1/12/2022 01:00 PM in Greenville Tele-Conference before District Judge Debra M. Brown. (jla)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 103 NOTICE by Corey D. Hinshaw on behalf of State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company, State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company re #51 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #52 Memorandum in Support Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals Opinion - Terry Black's) (Hinshaw, Corey)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 3/7/2022 09:45 AM in Greenville Courtroom 1 before District Judge Debra M. Brown. (jla)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE MVD/Jury Trial set November 15, 2021 re #100 Order on Motion to Continue (tab)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting #97 Motion to Continue trial until further notice. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 11/12/2021. (tab)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Minute Entry for Proceedings held before District Judge Debra M. Brown: Status Conference held on 11/12/2021. (Court Reporter Brenda Blackburn.) (Sanders, Jennifer)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 NOTICE of Conference: Status Conference set for 11/12/2021 10:30 AM in Greenville Courtroom 1 Video Conference before District Judge Debra M. Brown. (jla) Modified on 11/9/2021 to correct docket text as to location only (jtm).
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Joint MOTION to Continue Trial by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Gwin, Michael)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE by Corey D. Hinshaw on behalf of State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company, State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company re #51 MOTION for Summary Judgment Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Wild Eggs Holdings, Inc. v. State Auto Property & Casualty Ins. Co.) (Hinshaw, Corey)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 11/15/2021 09:45 AM in Greenville Courtroom 1 before District Judge Debra M. Brown. (jla)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Final Pretrial Conference held on 9/3/2021. Pretrial Order due by 9/8/2021. (bnd)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Consent MOTION to Bifurcate Trial by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Hinshaw, Corey)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re #83 MOTION in Limine to Bar Testimony or Evidence as to the Intent, Purpose, or Motivation Behind the Government Orders at Issue . (Brady, John)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 RESPONSE to Motion re #83 MOTION in Limine to Bar Testimony or Evidence as to the Intent, Purpose, or Motivation Behind the Government Orders at Issue filed by BBC, LLC, Columbus Deli, Inc., Grill Tupelo, LLC, University Management, Inc.. (Brady, John)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re #81 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony from Plaintiffs' Retained and Non-Retained Experts . (Brady, John)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 RESPONSE to Motion re #81 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony from Plaintiffs' Retained and Non-Retained Experts filed by BBC, LLC, Columbus Deli, Inc., Grill Tupelo, LLC, University Management, Inc.. (Brady, John)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 RESPONSE to Motion re #79 MOTION in Limine to Bar Testimony or Evidence of Conditions, Losses, or Circumstances Beyond the Expiration of the Applicable Period of Restoration filed by BBC, LLC, Columbus Deli, Inc., Grill Tupelo, LLC, University Management, Inc.. (Brady, John)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 RESPONSE to Motion re #77 MOTION in Limine to Bar Evidence or Argument of the Presence of the Virus at the Insured Premises filed by BBC, LLC, Columbus Deli, Inc., Grill Tupelo, LLC, University Management, Inc.. (Brady, John)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Certain Claims (JOINT). (Gwin, Michael)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER denying without prejudice #74 Motion for Hearing. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 8/31/2021. (jwr)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #83 MOTION in Limine to Bar Testimony or Evidence as to the Intent, Purpose, or Motivation Behind the Government Orders at Issue filed by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Gwin, Michael)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MOTION in Limine to Bar Testimony or Evidence as to the Intent, Purpose, or Motivation Behind the Government Orders at Issue by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Gwin, Michael)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #81 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony from Plaintiffs' Retained and Non-Retained Experts filed by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Gwin, Michael)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony from Plaintiffs' Retained and Non-Retained Experts by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Gwin, Michael)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #79 MOTION in Limine to Bar Testimony or Evidence of Conditions, Losses, or Circumstances Beyond the Expiration of the Applicable Period of Restoration filed by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Gwin, Michael)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MOTION in Limine to Bar Testimony or Evidence of Conditions, Losses, or Circumstances Beyond the Expiration of the Applicable Period of Restoration by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Gwin, Michael)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #77 MOTION in Limine to Bar Evidence or Argument of the Presence of the Virus at the Insured Premises filed by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Gwin, Michael)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MOTION in Limine to Bar Evidence or Argument of the Presence of the Virus at the Insured Premises by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - P's Resp to RTA) (Gwin, Michael)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #75 MOTION in Limine to Bar Evidence or Argument of the Coronavirus as a Cause of Plaintiffs' Loss(es) filed by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Gwin, Michael)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MOTION in Limine to Bar Evidence or Argument of the Coronavirus as a Cause of Plaintiffs' Loss(es) by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - P's Resp to RTA) (Gwin, Michael)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Joint MOTION for Hearing (status conference) by BBC, LLC, Columbus Deli, Inc., Grill Tupelo, LLC, University Management, Inc.. (Brady, John)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/3/2021 10:00 AM in Oxford Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Regarding Jury Instructions. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 8/17/2021. (jwr)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 TEXT ORDER: MOTIONS IN LIMINE DUE NO LATER THAN AUGUST 24, 2021 WITH RESPONSES DUE 7 DAYS AFTER MOTION. NO FURTHER ORDER WILL ISSUE. (no document attached) Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 8/17/21. (bnd) Modified on 8/18/2021 (jla).
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 9/27/2021 09:45 AM in Greenville Courtroom 1 before District Judge Debra M. Brown. (jla)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 TEXT ONLY NOTICE Cancelling Status Conference set for 8/27/2021. No document attached. (rtc)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Sharion Aycock recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Debra M. Brown for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 8/12/2021. (jwr)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE of Conference: Status Conference set for 8/27/2021 10:00 AM in Oxford Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 TEXT ONLY NOTICE Cancelling Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/27/2021. Separate notice to be entered setting status conference for the same date/time. No document attached. (rtc)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 TEXT ONLY ORDER requiring telephonic final pretrial conference. Counsel should call conference line 888-363-4735 (participant number 4317261) at previously scheduled time. There will be no in-person attendance permitted. No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 8/3/21. No document attached. (rtc)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #53 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BBC, LLC, Columbus Deli, Inc., Grill Tupelo, LLC, University Management, Inc.. (Ford, J.)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 REPLY to Response to Motion re #51 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Gwin, Michael)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 RESPONSE in Opposition re #53 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Depo of Sherri King) (Gwin, Michael)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #60 Response to Motion, #51 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Ford, J.)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 RESPONSE to Motion re #51 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BBC, LLC, Columbus Deli, Inc., Grill Tupelo, LLC, University Management, Inc.. (Ford, J.)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 RESPONSE in Opposition re #53 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Gwin, Michael)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting, but not to the extent requested, #57 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #53 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #51 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Responses now due by 7/1/2021. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 6/17/2021. (sko)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #51 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #53 MOTION for Summary Judgment by BBC, LLC, Columbus Deli, Inc., Grill Tupelo, LLC, University Management, Inc.. (Brady, John)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #55 Motion for Extension of Time. Responses now due on or before June 24, 2021. No further Order shall issue from this Court. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 6/4/2021. (lmd) (No document attached)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Gwin, Michael)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #53 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Ford, J.)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION for Summary Judgment by BBC, LLC, Columbus Deli, Inc., Grill Tupelo, LLC, University Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - BI Extension Endorsement, #2 Exhibit B - Certified copy of State Auto's policy, #3 Exhibit C - Amended Complaint for Damages and Other Relief, #4 Exhibit D - Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses and State Auto's Counterclaim, #5 Exhibit E - Designation of Experts of the Plaintiffs, #6 Exhibit F - Media reports regarding municipal closure orders, #7 Exhibit G - March 24, 2020 closure order, #8 Exhibit H - April 1, 2020 closure order, #9 Exhibit I - Deposition of Robert Fort, #10 Exhibit J - Property Loss Notice, #11 Exhibit K - Deposition of Jennifer Stivers, #12 Exhibit L - Claim log notes, #13 Exhibit M - Deposition of Tomi McElligott, #14 Exhibit N - Deposition of Van Hedges, #15 Exhibit O - Deposition of Brandt Galloway, #16 Exhibit P - State Auto's April 10, 2020 denial letter, #17 Exhibit Q - State Auto's June 3, 2020 denial letter, #18 Exhibit R - National Institutes of Health and Centers for Disease Control and Prevention articles) (Ford, J.)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #51 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Gwin, Michael)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Fort Deposition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiffs' Answers to Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit 3 - Part 1 - Certified State Auto Policy, #4 Exhibit 3 - Part 2 - Certified State Auto Policy, #5 Exhibit 4 - Executive Order No. 1463, #6 Exhibit 5 - Executive Order No. 1466) (Gwin, Michael)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures by Corey D. Hinshaw on behalf of State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company, State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Hinshaw, Corey)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 TEXT ONLY NOTICE Cancelling Settlement Conference set for 4/21/2021 at the parties request. No document attached. (rtc)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE to Take Deposition of 30(b)(6) of Plaintiffs Re-Notice by Corey D. Hinshaw on behalf of State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company, State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Hinshaw, Corey)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 TEXT ONLY ORDER requiring telephonic settlement conference. Counsel should call conference line 888-363-4735 (participant number 4317261) at previously scheduled time. There will be no in-person attendance permitted. No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/23/21. No document attached. (rtc)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA to Testify at a Deposition served on Brandt Galloway on 03/15/2021 by Corey D. Hinshaw on behalf of State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company, State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Deposition) (Hinshaw, Corey)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE to Take Deposition of 30(b)(6) of Plaintiffs by Corey D. Hinshaw on behalf of State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company, State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Hinshaw, Corey)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE to Take Deposition of E. Van Hedges by Corey D. Hinshaw on behalf of State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company, State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Hinshaw, Corey)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Brandt Galloway by Corey D. Hinshaw on behalf of State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company, State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Hinshaw, Corey)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #41 Motion to Extend CMO Defendants Designation of Experts due by 4/6/2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/8/21. (bnd)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Expert Designations and Disclosures (Unopposed) by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Hinshaw, Corey) Modified on 3/8/2021 (jla).
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Combined Supplemental Responses of Plaintiffs to Defendants First Set of Interrogatories by J. Douglas Ford on behalf of BBC, LLC, Columbus Deli, Inc., Grill Tupelo, LLC, University Management, Inc.. (Ford, J.)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Designation of Experts of the Plaintiffs by J. Douglas Ford on behalf of BBC, LLC, Columbus Deli, Inc., Grill Tupelo, LLC, University Management, Inc.. (Ford, J.)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to Interrogatories, Responses to Requests for Production, Responses to Requests for Admissions by John D. Brady, I on behalf of BBC, LLC, Columbus Deli, Inc., Grill Tupelo, LLC, University Management, Inc. to Defendant. (Brady, John)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Request to Permit Entry for Inspection by Corey D. Hinshaw on behalf of State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company to Plaintiffs. (Hinshaw, Corey)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Sherri King by John D. Brady, I on behalf of BBC, LLC, Columbus Deli, Inc., Grill Tupelo, LLC, University Management, Inc. (Brady, John)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE to Take Deposition of State Auto Property & Casualty Ins. Co. by John D. Brady, I on behalf of BBC, LLC, Columbus Deli, Inc., Grill Tupelo, LLC, University Management, Inc. (Brady, John)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Tomi McElligot by John D. Brady, I on behalf of BBC, LLC, Columbus Deli, Inc., Grill Tupelo, LLC, University Management, Inc. (Brady, John)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jennifer Stivers by John D. Brady, I on behalf of BBC, LLC, Columbus Deli, Inc., Grill Tupelo, LLC, University Management, Inc. (Brady, John)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA served on Galloway-Chandler-McKinney Ins., LLC on 01/28/2021 by Corey D. Hinshaw on behalf of State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company, State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Hinshaw, Corey)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 1/20/21. (bnd)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 AGREED ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 12/8/20. (bnd)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories and Requests for Production by Corey D. Hinshaw on behalf of State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company to Plaintiffs. (Hinshaw, Corey)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to Interrogatories and Responses to Requests for Production by Corey D. Hinshaw on behalf of State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company to p. (Hinshaw, Corey)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Interrogatories and Requests for Production by John D. Brady on behalf of BBC, LLC, Columbus Deli, Inc., Grill Tupelo, LLC, University Management, Inc. to Defendant. (Brady, John)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/1/2020. (rtc)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/27/2021 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 9/27/2021 09:40 AM in Aberdeen Bankruptcy Courthouse - Courtroom 2 before District Judge Sharion Aycock. (sko)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER regarding settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/1/2020. (rtc)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/27/2021 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Discovery due by 5/6/2021. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 10/1/2020. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 2/8/2021. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 3/8/2021. Motions due by 5/27/2021. Settlement Conference set for 4/21/2021 02:00 PM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/1/2020. (rtc)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 9/1/2020. (rtc)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by J. Douglas Ford on behalf of BBC, LLC, Columbus Deli, Inc., Grill Tupelo, LLC, University Management, Inc. to State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Ford, J.)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Corey D. Hinshaw on behalf of State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company to Plaintiffs. (Hinshaw, Corey)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ANSWER to #14 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by BBC, LLC, Columbus Deli, Inc., Grill Tupelo, LLC, University Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Endorsement Naming Insured, #2 Exhibit 2 Business Income and Extra Expense Endorsement) (Ford, J.)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER requiring telephonic case management conference. Counsel should call conference line 888-363-4735 (participant number 4317261) at previously scheduled time. There will be no in-person attendance permitted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 8/12/2020. (rtc)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #17 Amended Complaint; L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)2 and Administrative Procedures Section 3(A)8 requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings. (jla)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Jury Demand, filed by BBC, LLC, Columbus Deli, Inc., Grill Tupelo, LLC, University Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C) (Ford, J.)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Claims Against State Automobile Insurance Company and "State Auto Insurance Companies" and Consent and Stipulation for Plaintiffs to Amend Complaint. (Gwin, Michael)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 9/1/2020 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 7/28/2020. (rtc)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company, State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 - Policy, #2 Exhibit A-2 - Policy (continued), #3 Exhibit B - Executive Order 1463, #4 Exhibit C - Executive Order 1466, #5 Exhibit D - Property Loss Notice, #6 Exhibit E - April 10, 2020 letter, #7 Exhibit F - May 7, 2020 letter) (Gwin, Michael)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Adam H. Fleischer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 7/22/20. (bnd)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 EXHIBIT re #8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Adam H. Fleischer,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1830043) Certificate of Good Standing New York. (Hinshaw, Corey)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Matthew P. Fortin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 7/21/20. (bnd)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Lindsey D. Dean. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 7/21/20. (bnd)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Adam H. Fleischer,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1830043): Please provide Certificate of Good Standing from New York. (jwr)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Matthew P. Fortin,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1830045) by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company, State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company. (Hinshaw, Corey)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Adam H. Fleischer,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1830043) by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company, State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company. (Hinshaw, Corey)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Lindsey D. Dean,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1830039) by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company, State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company. (Hinshaw, Corey)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #4 by J. Douglas Ford on behalf of University Management, Inc., Columbus Deli, Inc., Grill Tupelo, LLC, BBC, LLC (Ford, J.) Modified on 7/20/2020 (jwr).
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION-SECOND NOTICE re #4 Summons Returned Executed: Please file first page of Summons. (jwr)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J. Douglas Ford on behalf of University Management, Inc., Columbus Deli, Inc., Grill Tupelo, LLC, BBC, LLC (Ford, J.) State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company served on 7/6/2020. Modified on 7/13/2020 (jwr).
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J. Douglas Ford on behalf of University Management, Inc., Columbus Deli, Inc., Grill Tupelo, LLC, BBC, LLC State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company served on 7/6/2020. (Ford, J.)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J. Douglas Ford on behalf of University Management, Inc., Columbus Deli, Inc., Grill Tupelo, LLC, BBC, LLC State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company served on 7/6/2020. (Ford, J.)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #4 Summons Returned Executed, #3 Summons Returned Executed: Please file first page of Summons. (jwr)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company, State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company; forwarded to Attorney for service. (jla)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1824196, filed by University Management, Inc., Columbus Deli, Inc., Grill Tupelo, LLC, BBC, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: University Management, Inc. et al v. State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grill Tupelo, LLC
Represented By: John D. Brady
Represented By: J. Douglas Ford
Represented By: Scott R. Hendrix
Represented By: John D. Brady, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BBC, LLC
Represented By: John D. Brady
Represented By: J. Douglas Ford
Represented By: Scott R. Hendrix
Represented By: John D. Brady, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Columbus Deli, Inc.
Represented By: John D. Brady
Represented By: J. Douglas Ford
Represented By: Scott R. Hendrix
Represented By: John D. Brady, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: University Management, Inc.
Represented By: John D. Brady
Represented By: J. Douglas Ford
Represented By: Scott R. Hendrix
Represented By: John D. Brady, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Corey D. Hinshaw
Represented By: Michael O'Mara Gwin
Represented By: Lindsey D. Dean
Represented By: William F. Ray
Represented By: Adam Hoyt Fleischer
Represented By: Matthew P. Fortin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company doing business as State Auto Insurance Companies
Represented By: Corey D. Hinshaw
Represented By: Michael O'Mara Gwin
Represented By: Lindsey D. Dean
Represented By: William F. Ray
Represented By: Adam Hoyt Fleischer
Represented By: Matthew P. Fortin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company doing business as State Auto Insurance Companies
Represented By: Corey D. Hinshaw
Represented By: Michael O'Mara Gwin
Represented By: Lindsey D. Dean
Represented By: William F. Ray
Represented By: Adam Hoyt Fleischer
Represented By: Matthew P. Fortin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?