Moe's OG BBQ MS Oxford, LLC v. Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Moe's OG BBQ MS Oxford, LLC
Defendant: Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, Does 1-3 and Renasant Insurance, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00173
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Michael P Mills
2 Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Moe's OG BBQ MS Oxford, LLC. (Spencer, William)
September 17, 2020 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #27 Response in Opposition to Motion, #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Policy Excerpts Opposition to Remand, #2 Exhibit 2 - Opposition Remand - Plaintiff_s 2020 LLC Annual Report) (Currie, Edward)
September 17, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Currie, Edward)
September 17, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Paul Varga on behalf of Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America (Varga, Gregory)
September 17, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen Edward Goldman on behalf of Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America (Goldman, Stephen)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/14/2020. (yf)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Gregory P. Varga. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/10/2020. (yf)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Stephen E. Goldman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/10/2020. (yf)
September 10, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Gregory P. Varga,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1849537) by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standiing) (Currie, Edward)
September 10, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Stephen E. Goldman,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1849515) by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standiing) (Currie, Edward)
September 10, 2020 NOTICE Cancelling Case Management Conference set for 9/22/2020 re #18 Order on Motion to Stay. No Document Attached. (rtc)
September 9, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Moe's OG BBQ MS Oxford, LLC. (Spencer, William)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/8/2020. (yf)
September 4, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Stay by Moe's OG BBQ MS Oxford, LLC. (Spencer, William)
September 3, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Spencer, William)
September 3, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Moe's OG BBQ MS Oxford, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Motion to Remand) (Spencer, William)
September 3, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William C. Spencer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Spencer, William)
September 3, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Collins Spencer, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Spencer, William)
August 27, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (DEFENDANT TRAVELERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS) filed by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Currie, Edward)
August 27, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (DEFENDANT TRAVELERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS) by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - Moe's OG BBQ MS Oxford LLC 2020 Annual Report, #2 Ex. 2 - Moe's 19-20 Policy, #3 Ex. 3 - Moe's OG BBQ Oxford LLC 2020 Annual Report) (Currie, Edward)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Renasant Insurance, Inc. answer due 9/21/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 8/19/20. (yf)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint - State Court by Renasant Insurance, Inc.. (Northington, Hiawatha)
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 State Court Complaint) (Currie, Edward)
August 18, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #5 State Court Record - Removal; Attorney to refile State Court Record as required by L.U.Civ.R. 5(b) and as described in Docket Entry #1 . (jla)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE STATEMENT Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Currie, Edward)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER requiring telephonic case management conference. Counsel should call conference line 888-363-4735 (participant number 4317261) at previously scheduled time. There will be no in-person attendance permitted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 8/17/2020. (rtc)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 9/22/2020 10:00 AM in Oxford Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 8/17/2020. (rtc)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Currie, Edward)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Sharion Aycock recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Michael P. Mills for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 8/14/20. (jla)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand , ANSWER to #2 Complaint - State Court with Jury Demand by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Currie, Edward)
August 13, 2020 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Moe's OG BBQ MS Oxford, LLC. (jla)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America from County Court of Lee County, case number CV2020-000686. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1839570) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint Served on Defendant, #2 Exhibit Summons Served on Defendant, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moe's OG BBQ MS Oxford, LLC v. Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Edward J. Currie, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen Edward Goldman
Represented By: Gregory Paul Varga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renasant Insurance, Inc.
Represented By: Hiawatha Northington, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moe's OG BBQ MS Oxford, LLC
Represented By: Michael D. Greer
Represented By: William C. Spencer
Represented By: William Collins Spencer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?