Blackmon v. Tupelo-Lee County Jail
Plaintiff: Gerald Wayne Blackmon
Defendant: Tupelo-Lee County Jail
Case Number: 1:2020cv00196
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Glen H Davidson
2 Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Filing 25 AMENDED / SUPPLEMENT TO DOCUMENT Amendment to #1 Complaint. (cb)
November 5, 2020 Filing 24 Letter/Correspondence from Gerald W. Blackmon. (cb)
November 5, 2020 Filing 23 SUPPLEMENT TO DOCUMENT #1 Complaint. (cb)
November 5, 2020 Filing 22 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #19 ORDER DENYING #18 Motion to Receive Relief from Harrasment. (cb)
October 26, 2020 Filing 21 Declaration of Gerald Blackmon. (jla)
October 26, 2020 Filing 20 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #15 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. (jla)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying #18 Motion to Receive Relief from Harrasment. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 10/26/20. (jla)
October 15, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Receive Relief from Harrasment by Gerald Wayne Blackmon. (jla) (Main Document 18 replaced on 10/19/2020) (jla).
October 15, 2020 Filing 17 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #11 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. (jla)
October 15, 2020 Filing 16 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #12 Order Spears Hearing set. (jla)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying #13 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 10/15/20. (jla)
October 13, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED / SUPPLEMENT TO DOCUMENT Amendment to #1 Complaint. (jla)
October 13, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Gerald Wayne Blackmon. (jla)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Spears Hearing set for 2/25/2021 10:00 AM in Amory Courtroom 1 Video Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 10/02/2020. (cb)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Without Assessing Payment of Initial Filing Fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 10/02/2020. (cb)
October 2, 2020 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT, and NOTICE of Intent to Continue Lawsuit re #4 Order Setting PSP Deadline. (cb)
October 2, 2020 Filing 9 Declination to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Case Reassigned to Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson. District Judge Sharion Aycock no longer assigned to the case. (cb)
October 2, 2020 Filing 8 Supplement to Motion re #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gerald Wayne Blackmon. (cb)
October 2, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED / SUPPLEMENT TO #1 Complaint. (cb)
October 2, 2020 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #5 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to Complete and Return In Forma Pauperis Application, Authorization and Certificate within 21 days re #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gerald Wayne Blackmon. (cb)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to Complete and Return In Forma Pauperis Application, Authorization and Certificate within 21 days re #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gerald Wayne Blackmon. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 9/24/2020. (cb)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting PSP Deadline: PSP Forms due by 10/24/2020. Signed by Clerk on 9/24/2020. (cb)
September 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (cb)
September 24, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gerald Wayne Blackmon. (cb)
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT challenging conditions of confinement, Jury Demand,, filed by Gerald Wayne Blackmon. (cb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackmon v. Tupelo-Lee County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tupelo-Lee County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Wayne Blackmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?