Doe v. Mississippi State University et al
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Jane Roe, Dr. Thomas Bourgeois and Mississippi State University
Case Number: 1:2020cv00199
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Neal B Biggers
2 Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Including Immunity Defenses Plaintiff's Motion in Response to Defendant Dr. Thomas Bourgeois' Motion to Dismiss Claims for Monetary Relief filed by John Doe. (Stone, Susan)
November 25, 2020 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #32 Response in Support of Motion Plaintiff John Doe's Memorandum of Law to Reply in Support of Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by John Doe. (Stone, Susan)
November 25, 2020 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Support re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiff John Doe's Reply in Support of Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by John Doe. (Stone, Susan)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Replies due by 11/25/2020.. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 11/20/2020. (llw)
November 17, 2020 Filing 30 Restricted Document - Main Document is Exhibit 1 - Hearing Transcript. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 - Final Hearing Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 3 - Report of Sexual Misconduct, #3 Exhibit 4 - Investigator Notes from Meeting with Roe, #4 Exhibit 5 - Notification of Sexual Misconduct Investigation, #5 Exhibit 6 - Investigator Notes from Meeting with Doe, #6 Exhibit 7 - Student Disciplinary Option Form, #7 Exhibit 8 - E-mails from Doe's Attorney, #8 Exhibit 9 - Email to Doe Regarding First Revisions to Memorandum, #9 Exhibit 10 - E-mail Regarding Revision to Include Roe's Friend, #10 Exhibit 11 - E-mail Regarding Continuance, #11 Exhibit 12 - Internal E-mails Regarding Follow-up with Doe's Attorney, #12 Exhibit 13 - April 23, 2020 Memorandum Draft, #13 Exhibit 14 - E-mail to Doe's Attorney Regarding Information from Roe's Friend, #14 Exhibit 15 - Notice of May 5, 2020 Hearing, #15 Exhibit 16 - Doe's Fisrt Proposed Revisions to Memorandum, #16 Exhibit 17 - E-mail to Roe Regarding Revisions) (jla)
November 17, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction; All related filings to motion should be linked back to the original motion. Court staff has made the correction. (jla)
November 17, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #25 MOTION to Seal (Unopposed Motion to File Exhibits Under Seal), #26 Memorandum in Support; All related filings to motion should be linked back to the original motion. Court staff has made the correction. (jla)
November 17, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING of Exhibits 1-17 to MSU and Bourgeois Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction [dkt. #24] (Exhibits Filed Under Seal) by Ashlyn Brown Matthews on behalf of Thomas Bourgeois, Mississippi State University. (Matthews, Ashlyn) Modified on 11/17/2020 (jla).
November 17, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response Reply Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by John Doe. (Stone, Susan) Modified on 11/17/2020 (jla). Modified on 11/17/2020 (jla).
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 11/17/20. (def)
November 12, 2020 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #24 Response in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Thomas Bourgeois, Mississippi State University. (Matthews, Ashlyn) Modified on 11/17/2020 (jla).
November 12, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION to Seal (Unopposed Motion to File Exhibits Under Seal) re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Thomas Bourgeois, Mississippi State University. (Matthews, Ashlyn) Modified on 11/17/2020 (jla).
November 12, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Thomas Bourgeois, Mississippi State University. (Matthews, Ashlyn)
November 12, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym and for Protective Order filed by Thomas Bourgeois, Mississippi State University. (Winfield, Charles)
November 12, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Thomas Bourgeois, Mississippi State University. (Winfield, Charles)
November 12, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, (Subject to Motion to Dismiss) by Thomas Bourgeois. (Winfield, Charles)
November 12, 2020 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Including Immunity Defenses . (Winfield, Charles)
November 12, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Including Immunity Defenses by Thomas Bourgeois. (Winfield, Charles)
November 12, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Mississippi State University. (Winfield, Charles)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thomas Bourgeois answer due 11/12/2021; Mississippi State University answer due 11/12/2021; granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #3 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym and for Protective Order , #7 MOTION to Expedite Discovery, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Responses due by 11/12/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 10/29/20. (def)
October 27, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Unopposed), MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #3 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym and for Protective Order , #7 MOTION to Expedite Discovery (Unopposed) by Thomas Bourgeois, Mississippi State University. (Matthews, Ashlyn)
October 22, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; Jane Roe waiver sent on 10/2/2020. (Hill, Sidney)
October 14, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sidney Ray Hill, III on behalf of John Doe Thomas Bourgeois served on 10/7/2020. (Hill, Sidney)
October 14, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sidney Ray Hill, III on behalf of John Doe Mississippi State University served on 10/7/2020. (Hill, Sidney)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 #11 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Susan C. Stone and Kristina W. Supler for the plaintiff; Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 10/5/20. (def)
October 2, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #3 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym and for Protective Order , #7 MOTION to Expedite Discovery; Section 5(B) of Administrative Procedures for ECF states proposed orders are not to be filed as an attachment to a pleading; attorney to email proposed order to chambers. (jla)
October 1, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Susan C. Stone,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1857798) by John Doe. (Hill, Sidney)
October 1, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Kristina W. Supler,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1857795) by John Doe. (Hill, Sidney)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Sharion Aycock recused. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 10/1/20. (jla)
September 30, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #7 MOTION to Expedite Discovery . (Hill, Sidney)
September 30, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Discovery Requests, #2 Exhibit 2. Proposed Order) (Hill, Sidney)
September 30, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Hill, Sidney)
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Updated Sexual Misconduct Policy) (Hill, Sidney)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #3 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym and for Protective Order . (Hill, Sidney)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym and for Protective Order by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Proposed Order) (Hill, Sidney)
September 30, 2020 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Thomas Bourgeois, Mississippi State University; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1857340, filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Code of Conduct, #2 Exhibit 2 - Sexual Misconduct Policy, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice to John, #4 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Hearing Outcome, #5 Exhibit 5 - Appeal Denial, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Mississippi State University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Thomas Bourgeois
Represented By: Ashlyn Brown Matthews
Represented By: Charles E. Winfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi State University
Represented By: Ashlyn Brown Matthews
Represented By: Charles E. Winfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Sidney Ray Hill, III
Represented By: Susan C. Stone
Represented By: Kristina W. Supler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?