Burrage v. Lee County Adult Jail
Plaintiff: Jamey Paul Burrage
Defendant: Lee County Adult Jail
Case Number: 1:2020cv00222
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2020 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. (jla)
November 30, 2020 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #8 Order Spears Hearing set for 4/27/2021. (jla)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Spears Hearing set for 4/27/2021 10:00 AM in Oxford Courtroom 2 Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/12/2020. (cb)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Without Assessing Payment of Initial Filing Fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/12/2020. (cb)
November 12, 2020 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT, NOTICE of Intent to Continue Lawsuit re #4 Order Setting PSP Deadline. (cb) Modified on 11/12/2020 (cb).
November 12, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Jamey Paul Burrage. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (cb)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting PSP Deadline: PSP Forms due by 12/3/2020.. Signed by Clerk on 11/3/2020. (cb)
November 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Percy. (cb)
November 2, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jamey Paul Burrage. (cb)
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT challenging conditions of confinement, Jury Demand, filed by Jamey Paul Burrage. (cb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burrage v. Lee County Adult Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamey Paul Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee County Adult Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?