Billingsley v. Lowndes County, Mississippi et al
Plaintiff: Ralph Billingsley
Defendant: Lowndes County, Mississippi, Harry (NMI) Sanders, John Holliman and Harry Sanders
Case Number: 1:2021cv00053
Filed: March 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2022 Filing 50 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #49 Memorandum in Support, #48 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ralph Billingsley. (Woodruff, Ronnie)
May 12, 2022 Filing 49 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #48 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Dambrino, Robert)
May 12, 2022 Filing 48 MOTION for Summary Judgment by John Holliman, Lowndes County, Mississippi, Harry Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Notice of Intent to Retire, #2 Exhibit B, EEOC Charge of Discrimination, #3 Exhibit C, Deposition Excerpts of Ralph Billingsley, #4 Exhibit D, Deposition Excerpts of Trip Hairston, #5 Exhibit E, Deposition Excerpts of Harry Sanders, #6 Exhibit F, Deposition Excerpts of John Holliman, #7 Exhibit G, Deposition Excerpts of Lloyd Price) (Dambrino, Robert)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 CORRECTED TEXT ONLY ORDER re 46 Order on Motion to Extend CMO Deadlines. The motions deadline is extended to May 12, 2022. The discovery deadline remains unchanged. No further order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 4/29/22. No document attached. (def)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #45 Motion to Extend CMO. Motions due by 5/12/2022. No further order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 4/29/22. No document attached. (def)
April 28, 2022 Filing 45 MOTION to Extend CMO Deadlines by John Holliman, Lowndes County, Mississippi, Harry Sanders. (Dambrino, Robert)
April 26, 2022 Filing 44 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses of Defendant, Lowndes County, Mississippi, to Plaintiffs Second Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents by Robert J. Dambrino, III on behalf of Lowndes County, Mississippi to All Counsel of Record. (Dambrino, Robert)
April 6, 2022 Filing 43 NOTICE OF RECEIPT by Ronnie Lee Woodruff on behalf of Ralph Billingsley OF ORIGINAL DEPOSITION of Greg Andrews/Cindy Lawrence. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cover Sheets for Exhibits A - Greg Andrews B - Cindy Lawrence) (Woodruff, Ronnie)
March 30, 2022 Filing 42 NOTICE OF RECEIPT by Ronnie Lee Woodruff on behalf of Ralph Billingsley OF ORIGINAL DEPOSITION of Ronnie Smith/Harry Sanders/Lloyd Price/John Holliman/Leroy Brooks/Trip Hairston/Jeff Smith/Cindy Goode/Jay Fisher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cover Sheets for Exhibits A-Ronnie Smith B-Harry Sanders C-Lloyd Price D-John Holliman E-Leroy Brooks F-Trip Hairston G-Jeff Smith H-Cindy Goode I-Jay Fisher) (Woodruff, Ronnie)
March 16, 2022 Filing 41 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Zoom Deposition of Greg Andrews/Cindy Lawrence by Ronnie Lee Woodruff on behalf of Ralph Billingsley (Woodruff, Ronnie)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #38 Motion to Extend CMO. Discovery due by 4/14/2022. Motions due by 4/28/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 3/8/22. (cs)
March 8, 2022 Filing 39 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production by Ronnie Lee Woodruff on behalf of Ralph Billingsley to Defendant Lowndes County. (Woodruff, Ronnie)
March 8, 2022 Filing 38 MOTION to Extend CMO Deadlines by Ralph Billingsley. (Woodruff, Ronnie)
February 28, 2022 Filing 37 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA Deposition Subpoena served on Ronnie Smith on 2-8-2022 by Ronnie Lee Woodruff on behalf of Ralph Billingsley. (Woodruff, Ronnie)
February 22, 2022 Filing 36 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders: Telephonic Settlement Conference held on 2/22/2022. No Settlement Agreement (jf)
February 18, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Harry Sanders/John Holliman/Trip Hairston/Jeff Smith/Leroy Brooks/Greg Andrews/Lloyd Price/Cindy Lawrence/Cindy Goode/Jay Fisher/Ronnie Smith by Ronnie Lee Woodruff on behalf of Ralph Billingsley (Woodruff, Ronnie)
February 4, 2022 Filing 34 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Cash Matlock/Ronnie Smith/Harry Sanders/John Holliman/Trip Hairston/Jeff Smith/Leroy Brooks/Greg Andrews/Lloyd Price/Cindy Lawrence/Cindy Goode by Ronnie Lee Woodruff on behalf of Ralph Billingsley (Woodruff, Ronnie)
February 1, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ralph Billingsley by Robert J. Dambrino, III on behalf of John Holliman, Lowndes County, Mississippi, Harry Sanders (Dambrino, Robert)
January 12, 2022 TEXT ONLY NOTICE resetting Conference:Telephonic Settlement Conference reset for 2/22/2022 at 01:30 PM in Amory Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Confidential memos due 2/15/22. No document attached. (cs)
December 6, 2021 Filing 32 ANSWER to #31 Amended Complaint, by John Holliman, Lowndes County, Mississippi, Harry Sanders. (Dambrino, Robert)
November 22, 2021 Filing 31 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against John Holliman, Lowndes County, Mississippi, Harry Sanders, Jury Demand, filed by Ralph Billingsley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit B - First Right to Sue Notice, #3 Exhibit C - Second EEOC Charge, #4 Exhibit D - Second Right to Sue Notice) (Woodruff, Ronnie)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 11/19/21. (def)
November 4, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses of Defendant, Harry Sanders, to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents by Robert J. Dambrino, III on behalf of Harry Sanders to All Counsel of Record. (Dambrino, Robert)
November 4, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses of Defendant, John Holliman, to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents by Robert J. Dambrino, III on behalf of John Holliman to All Counsel of Record. (Dambrino, Robert)
November 4, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses of Defendant, Lowndes County, Mississippi, to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents by Robert J. Dambrino, III on behalf of Lowndes County, Mississippi to All Counsel of Record. (Dambrino, Robert)
November 3, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION to Amend/Correct #4 Amended Complaint by Ralph Billingsley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Second Amended Complaint) (Woodruff, Ronnie)
October 19, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses of Defendant, Harry Sanders, to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admissions by Robert J. Dambrino, III on behalf of Harry Sanders to all counsel of record. (Dambrino, Robert)
October 8, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Responses to Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents by Ronnie Lee Woodruff on behalf of Ralph Billingsley. (Woodruff, Ronnie)
October 6, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Supplemental Pre-Discovery Disclosure of Core Information by Ronnie Lee Woodruff on behalf of Ralph Billingsley to Defendants. (Woodruff, Ronnie)
October 4, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production of Documents, and Requests for Admissions by Ronnie Lee Woodruff on behalf of Ralph Billingsley to Defendant Harry Sanders. (Woodruff, Ronnie)
October 4, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production by Ronnie Lee Woodruff on behalf of Ralph Billingsley to Defendant John Holliman. (Woodruff, Ronnie)
October 4, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production by Ronnie Lee Woodruff on behalf of Ralph Billingsley to Defendant Lowndes County, Mississippi. (Woodruff, Ronnie)
September 24, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to the Plaintiff by Robert J. Dambrino, III on behalf of John Holliman, Lowndes County, Mississippi, Harry Sanders to Jim D. Waide III, Esq. and Ronnie Lee Woodruff, Esq.. (Dambrino, Robert)
August 4, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 10/17/2022 09:40 AM in Aberdeen Bankruptcy Courthouse - Courtroom 2 before District Judge Sharion Aycock. (tjw)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/8/2022 at 1:30 PM in Oxford Visiting Magistrate Judge Chambers before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Discovery due by 3/14/2022. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 11/8/2021. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 1/3/2022. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 2/7/2022. Motions due by 3/28/2022. Settlement Conference set for 2/3/2022 at 1:30 PM in Oxford Visiting Magistrate Judge Chambers before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 8/4/2021. (jf)
August 2, 2021 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 8/2/2021. Case Management Order to be entered. (jf)
August 2, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Pre-Discovery Disclosure of Core Information by Ronnie Lee Woodruff on behalf of Ralph Billingsley to Defendants. (Woodruff, Ronnie)
July 30, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Pre-Discovery Disclosures of Core Information by Robert J. Dambrino, III on behalf of John Holliman, Lowndes County, Mississippi, Harry Sanders to all counsel. (Dambrino, Robert)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CORRECTED INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 8/2/2021 10:30 AM in Amory Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. CMO and Confidential Settlement Memoranda are due on July 19, 2021. Conference number 877-336-1839 Access code 6893215. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 6/10/21. (def)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 8/2/2021 10:30 AM in Amory Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Confidential Settlement Memoranda and proposed CMO are due not later than July 19, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 6/10/21. (def)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' #10 Joint Answer filed 5/25/21. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 6/1/21. (cs)
May 25, 2021 Filing 10 JOINT ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by John Holliman, Lowndes County, Mississippi, Harry Sanders. (Dambrino, Robert)
May 25, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Philip Halbert Neilson, I on behalf of Harry Sanders, John Holliman, and Lowndes County, Mississippi (Neilson, Philip) Modified on 5/26/2021 (jla).
May 14, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jim D. Waide, III on behalf of Ralph Billingsley John Holliman served on 4/15/2021. (Waide, Jim)
May 14, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jim D. Waide, III on behalf of Ralph Billingsley Harry Sanders served on 5/7/2020. (Waide, Jim)
May 14, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jim D. Waide, III on behalf of Ralph Billingsley Lowndes County, Mississippi served on 4/15/2021. (Waide, Jim)
May 14, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by John Holliman, Lowndes County, Mississippi, Harry Sanders. (Dambrino, Robert)
May 7, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against John Holliman, Lowndes County, Mississippi, Harry Sanders, Jury Demand, filed by Ralph Billingsley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit B: Right to Sue Letter) (Waide, Jim)
April 20, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Lowndes County, Mississippi, Harry Sanders, and John Holliman (jla)
March 17, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to John Holliman, Lowndes County, Mississippi, Harry (NMI) Sanders; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
March 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-1921578, filed by Ralph Billingsley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EEOC Charge, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
March 17, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Billingsley v. Lowndes County, Mississippi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowndes County, Mississippi
Represented By: Robert J. Dambrino, III
Represented By: Philip Halbert Neilson, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry (NMI) Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Holliman
Represented By: Robert J. Dambrino, III
Represented By: Philip Halbert Neilson, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Sanders
Represented By: Robert J. Dambrino, III
Represented By: Philip Halbert Neilson, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Billingsley
Represented By: Jim D. Waide, III
Represented By: Ronnie Lee Woodruff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?