Vanlandingham v. Southeast Financial Credit Union et al
Plaintiff: Lenwood Vanlandingham
Defendant: Southeast Financial Credit Union and Minnesota Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00054
Filed: March 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Southeast Financial Credit Union. (Peeples, Timothy)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 4/22/21. (cs)
April 22, 2021 Filing 5 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Minnesota Life Insurance Company. (Simpkins, Kelly)
April 22, 2021 Set Deadlines: Southeast Financial Credit Union answer due 4/30/21. (cs)
April 22, 2021 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Southeast Financial Credit Union answer due 4/30/2021. (jla)
April 21, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Southeast Financial Credit Union. (Peeples, Timothy)
April 13, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by W. Howard Gunn on behalf of Lenwood Vanlandingham All Defendants. (Gunn, W.)
March 18, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Southeast Financial Credit Union; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
March 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-1922305, filed by Lenwood Vanlandingham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
March 18, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vanlandingham v. Southeast Financial Credit Union et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeast Financial Credit Union
Represented By: Timothy Michael Peeples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Kelly D. Simpkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenwood Vanlandingham
Represented By: W. Howard Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?